Berlage et al v. Google, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Matthew Berlage, James Fairbanks and Aaron Linsky
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv02187
Filed: May 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 RELATED CASE ORDER. On or before 11/8/2010, Plaintiffs shall file a Master Consolidated Complaint that includes all claims against Defendant Google, both Federal and State. The Court will set an interim Case Management Conference once the Master Consolidated Complaint is filed. C 10-04007 HRL Joffe v. Google, Inc. and C 10-04084 PVT Marigza et al v. Google, Inc. shall be added as a member cases to C 10-02184 JW In re Google Street View. C 10-02187 JW Berlage et al v. Google, Inc. has previously been added as a member case to C 10-02184 JW In re Google Street View. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 13, 2010 Filing 40 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/13/2010 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 9/13/2010). The Court to issue further order following conference. (Court Reporter Unreported.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/13/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H. Rubin Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Defendant Google Inc., David H. Kramer, Michael H. Rubin, Bart E. Volkmer and Caroline E. Wilson (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 3, 2010 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all discovery matters. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR FILING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT in case 5:10-cv-02187-JW; denying (14) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:10-md-02184-JW. Deadline to file Joint Case Management Conference statement due by 9/7/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/2/2010. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER RELATING CASE. The Court finds that 5:10-md-02184-JW and C 10-02187 JW, 5:10-cv-03215-PVT, 5:10-cv-03272-PVT, 5:10-cv-03297-PVT, 5:10-cv-03715-PVT ARE RELATED. Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/3/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 36 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2010. Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 35 TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the Northern District of California are transferred to the Northern District of California, assigned to the Honorable James Ware be part of MDL No. 10-2184 JW (PVT). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this litigation is renamed "In re: Google Inc. Street View Electronic Communications Litigation." (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010) Modified on 8/20/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER RELATING CASE. The Court finds 10-03286 PVT is related to 10-02187 JW. The parties shall file joint case management conference statements in each respective case docket Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/11/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010) Modified on 8/11/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2010 Filing 33 Proposed Order re 31 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-12 by Sharon Sedita. (Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 28, 2010 Filing 32 Declaration of Cadio Zirpoli in Support of 31 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-12 filed bySharon Sedita. (Related document(s) 31 ) (Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 28, 2010 Filing 31 MOTION to Relate Case C10-3286 PVT and C10-2187 JW filed by Sharon Sedita. (Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 7/28/2010) Modified on 7/28/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2010 Filing 30 Received Document courtesy copy of Notice of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument filed in MDL Docket No. 2184 by Matthew Berlage, James Fairbanks, Aaron Linsky. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
July 2, 2010 Filing 29 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gigi C. Hoang (Hoang, Gigi) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 26 Motion to Relate Case. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court shall immediately relate Berlage, Linsky, Fairbanks and Bergin v. Google Inc., Case No. C 10-02187-JW and Stokes v. Google Inc., Case No. C 10-02306- JF. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/29/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 29, 2010 Related cases: Create association to 5:10-cv-02306-JF. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 28, 2010 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE of Summons, 1 Complaint, and Civil Case Coversheet (Curtis, Robert) (Filed on 6/28/2010) Modified on 6/29/2010,(counsel selected incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2010 Filing 26 MOTION to Relate C10-2306 JF Case filed by Matthew Berlage, James Fairbanks, Aaron Linsky. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Sean Reis, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reis, Sean) (Filed on 6/24/2010) Modified on 6/29/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2010 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Curtis re: MDL No. 2184 In Re: Google Inc., Interception of Electronic Communications Litigation JPML Form 18 (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010) Modified on 6/24/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeffrey S. Goldenberg. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/21/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Todd B. Naylor. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/21/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 17, 2010 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeffrey S. Goldenberg ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611007547.) filed by Matthew Berlage, James Fairbanks, Aaron Linsky. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 17, 2010 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Todd B. Naylor ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611007546.) filed by Matthew Berlage, James Fairbanks, Aaron Linsky. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christian A. Jenkins. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/16/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David J. Burman. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/16/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
June 11, 2010 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice David J. Burman ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611007519.) filed by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 11, 2010 Filing 17 NOTICE by Google, Inc. Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice (Hoang, Gigi) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 9, 2010 Filing 16 NOTICE by Google, Inc. of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Filing (Attachments: # 1 Motion, # 2 Memorandum, # 3 Schedule of Actions)(Fahringer, Susan) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 15 Defendant's Initial Response to ( 9 ) Ex-Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed byGoogle, Inc.(srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google, Inc. re 12 Memorandum in Opposition Defendant's Initial Response to Ex-Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Fahringer, Susan) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO, EXPEDITED DISCOVERY AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge James Ware denying 9 Ex Parte Application (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 12 Memorandum in Opposition DEFENDANTS INITIAL RESPONSE TO ( 9 ) EX-PARTE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Fahringer, Susan) (Filed on 6/4/2010) Modified text to add linkage on 6/10/2010 (srm, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2010 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Matthew Berlage, James Fairbanks, Aaron Linsky re 9 Emergency Ex Parte Application for TRO, Expedited Discovery, and an OSC Re Preliminary Injunction (Karczag, Justin) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against Google, Inc.. Filed byMatthew Berlage, Aaron Linsky, James Fairbanks. (Karczag, Justin) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 Filing 9 Emergency Ex Parte Application for TRO, Expedited Discovery, and an OSC Re Preliminary Injunction filed by Matthew Berlage, James Fairbanks, Aaron Linsky. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Justin P. Karczag, # 2 Exhibit A-I to the Karczag Declaration, # 3 Affidavit Michael B. Wilson, # 4 Exhibit J-N to Wilson Declaration, # 5 Exhibit O, part 1, to Wilson Declaration, # 6 Exhibit O, part 2, to Wilson Declaration, # 7 Exhibit P-Q to Wilson Declaration, # 8 Proposed Order)(Karczag, Justin) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge James Ware for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 06/01/2010. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
June 1, 2010 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
June 1, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings:, ***Deadlines terminated. 6 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2010. Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
May 28, 2010 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christian A. Jenkins ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611007440.) filed by Matthew Berlage, James Fairbanks, Aaron Linsky. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 26, 2010 Filing 5 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States Distict Judge by Matthew Berlage, James Fairbanks, Aaron Linsky (Karczag, Justin) (Filed on 5/26/2010) Modified on 5/27/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2010 Filing 4 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE DOCKET ( 5 )*** Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate and Request for Reassignment to a United States Distict Judge by Matthew Berlage, James Fairbanks, Aaron Linsky. (Karczag, Justin) (Filed on 5/26/2010) Modified on 5/27/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2010 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2010. Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Judge Trumbull Standing Order for Civil Practice in Assigned Cases for all Purposes, # 2 Standing Order Regarding Case Management in Civil Cases for all San Jose Judges, # 3 Standing Orders for All Judges of the Northern California District Court) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 20, 2010 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 20, 2010 Filing 1 Class Action COMPLAINT (Summons Issued); jury demand; against Google, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611007393.). Filed byMatthew Berlage, Aaron Linsky, James Fairbanks. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 20, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berlage et al v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Berlage
Represented By: Peter J. Bezek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Fairbanks
Represented By: Peter J. Bezek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Linsky
Represented By: Peter J. Bezek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?