Santiago v. Whole House Building Supply et al

Plaintiff: Jose Santiago
Defendant: Whole House Building Supply and Paul Gardener
Case Number: 5:2010cv02526
Filed: June 8, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 62 Stipulation filed by Jose Santiago. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 10/31/2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
September 9, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING PENDING HEARINGS, DENYING MOTIONS AS MOOT, AND VACATING TRIAL DATE re 59 Settlement Conference, Motions terminated: 48 First MOTION in Limine filed by Jose Santiago, 51 First MOTION to Dismiss AND FOR SANCTIONS filed by Paul Gardener.. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 9/9/2011. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 8, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY re 49 Proposed Order filed by Paul Gardener. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 9/8/2011. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011) (Clerk made changes to DAR per Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney) Modified on 9/9/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Referring Case for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on June 17, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
May 18, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving 35 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 18, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
May 5, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 30 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Whole House Building Supply. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 4, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
April 5, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Case Management ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 5, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
March 28, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference and Setting Deadline To Consent or To Request Reassignment. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 28, 2011. (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
December 23, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference to February 22, 2010. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/22/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 13, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 15 Granting Substitution of Attorney. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/8/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 8, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference to December 21, 2010. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/8/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
August 19, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 7 Extending Time to Respond, Case Deadlines and Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 8/10/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 8/19/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santiago v. Whole House Building Supply et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Santiago
Represented By: Adam Lee Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whole House Building Supply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Gardener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?