November 20, 2015 |
Filing
197
ORDER granting 180 Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; granting in part and denying in part 181 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Plaintiff shall file a proposed judgment consistent with this order on or before 12/4/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/20/2015. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
|
July 16, 2015 |
Filing
191
INTERIM ORDER RE: MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT 180 , 181 . Counsel for Lead Plaintiff shall submit a supplemental pleading on or before 8/28/2015. Counsel shall also lodge with the court itemized billings on or before 7/31/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/16/2015. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2015) Modified text on 7/16/2015 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
|
March 31, 2015 |
Filing
179
ORDER granting 167 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. A hearing on the final approval shall be held on 7/16/2015 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/31/2015. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
|
November 20, 2014 |
Filing
174
ORDER Requesting Additional Information re: 167 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Having reviewed the parties' submissions and heard oral argument, the court finds that there is insufficient information to determi ne whether the parties' proposed settlement agreement is reasonable. The court hereby requests additional information to be filed on or before December 19, 2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/20/2014. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2014)
|
September 2, 2014 |
Filing
168
ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Having reviewed the parties' Joint Case Management Conference Statement, the court finds that a scheduling conference is unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference schedule d for September 5, 2014, is VACATED. In addition, the pending Motion to Dismiss (Docket Item No. 134) is TERMINATED in the light of the Motion for Preliminary Approval filed on August 29, 2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/2/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
|
July 31, 2014 |
Filing
164
AMENDED ORDER GRANTING 162 Order on Stipulation to continue Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/31/2014. (Correction of 163 )(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
|
April 21, 2014 |
Filing
157
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Having reviewed the parties' Joint Case Management Conference Statement, the court has determined that a scheduling conference is premature at this time. Accordingly, the 4/25/2014 Case Management Conference is VACATED. the court will reset the conference if necessary upon resolution of PricewaterhouseCooper LLP's motion to dismiss. ***4/25/2014 CMC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/21/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
|
February 25, 2014 |
Filing
146
Order granting 113 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 2/25/2014. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
|
September 11, 2013 |
Filing
98
AMENDED ORDER re 96 Order RE: COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULE 79-5. The court extends the deadline for Defendants or any other interested party to file a declaration pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5(d) until Friday, 9/13/2013 at 4:00 p.m. Lead counsel for Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order on any other interested party who has previously made confidentiality designations that may be affected by a sealing order. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/10/2013. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/10/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
|
September 10, 2013 |
Filing
96
ORDER RE: COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULE 79-5. The court extends the deadline for Defendants or any other interested party to file a declaration pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5(d) until Friday, 9/12/2013 at 4:00 p.m. Lead counsel for Plaintif f shall serve a copy of this order on any other interested party who has previously made confidentiality designations that may be affected by a sealing order. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/10/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
|
September 3, 2013 |
Filing
95
ORDER denying 69 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/3/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
|
April 3, 2013 |
Filing
92
STIPULATION AND ORDER Modifying Case Management Order re 91 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 75 Case Management Scheduling Order. *** 75 CMO Deadlines terminated. Set/Reset Deadlines: Fact Discovery cutoff 2/5/2014. Last Date for Filing Dispositive Motions due by 3/11/2014. Expert Discovery cutoff 4/4/2014. Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement due by 12/19/2013. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/3/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/3/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
|
December 17, 2012 |
Filing
80
Order Granting 78 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Amend Defendants' Answer. Answer due 1/7/2013.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
|
October 5, 2012 |
Filing
71
Order Granting 70 Stipulation Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 10/5/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
|
September 4, 2012 |
Filing
65
ORDER denying 48 Motion to Dismiss. Celera shall file its answer within 14 days of the date of this order. The court schedules this case for a Case Management Conference on 10/26/2012 at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Statement on or before 10/19/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/4/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
|
March 14, 2012 |
Filing
64
ORDER GRANTING 63 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE filed by Washtenaw County Employees Retirement System. Sarah R. Holloway terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/14/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
|
November 23, 2011 |
Filing
61
STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING 12/2/2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 60 Stipulation. The case management conference currently scheduled for December 2, 2011, shall be rescheduled to a date and time that is convenient to the Court not less than 30 days after the Court has ruled on Defendants' pending motion to dismiss; and the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Conference Statement ten days before the conference. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/23/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
|
June 16, 2011 |
Filing
47
STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Response to Second Amended Complaint re 46 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 46 Stipulation: Motion due by 6/21/2011. Opposition due by 8/4/2011. Reply due by 9/1/2011. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/16/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
|
April 22, 2011 |
Filing
42
ORDER Granting Withdrawal of Daniel J. Vecchio as Counsel for Defendants re 41 Notice of Change In Counsel. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/22/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
|
March 24, 2011 |
Filing
40
STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to (i) Amendment to the Complaint and (ii) Vacating the March 28, 2011 Hearing Date and Case Management Conference re 39 Stipulation. Amended Complaint due by 5/6/2011. Answer or Responsive Pleading due by 6 /21/2011. Opposition due by 6/21/2011. Reply due by 9/1/2011. Anticipated Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 9/9/2011. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. ***3/28/2011 Hearing/Deadlines terminated. Motions terminated: 29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/24/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
|
November 2, 2010 |
Filing
27
STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Continuing Case Management Conference; Setting Briefing Schedule re Motion to Dismiss. Motion to Dismiss due by 11/29/2010. Opposition due by 1/13/2011. Reply due by 2/14/2011. Anticipated Motion Hear ing set for 3/7/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Joint Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/25/2011. Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/2/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
|
July 8, 2010 |
Filing
7
STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Extending Time to Respond to Complaint re 6 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/8/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
|