Delgado et al v. Deanda et al
Plaintiff: Martin Delgado, Ricardo Delgado, Angel Martinez and Adrian Acoltzi
Defendant: Maria Deanda and Ruben Deanda
Case Number: 5:2010cv02799
Filed: June 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 98 Motion for Sanctions (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER re 85 Supplemental Discovery Letter Brief to Discovery Dispute Joint Report #1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/22/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER denying 79 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; ORDER re 82 DDJR #1, 83 Plaintiffs' Supplemental Report on DDJR#1. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2013. Case Management Conference continued to 9/10/2013 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on July 29, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Consent to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 23, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Directing Defendants to File a Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 12, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh requiring Plaintiff to File New Certificate of Service; Setting Initial Case Management Conference; Granting in Part 41 Ex Parte Application.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 39 Stipulation; granting 27 Motion to Set Aside Judgment; denying 28 Motion to Stay (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 37 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to File (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delgado et al v. Deanda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Delgado
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Delgado
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Martinez
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Acoltzi
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Deanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Deanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?