Goodlick v. Apple, Inc.

Plaintiff: Michael James Goodlick, Vinny Curbelo, Karen Young, Trevor Antunez, Nicole Stankovitz, Jaclyn Badolato, Jessica Lares, Joshua Gilson, Bryan Colver, Brandon Ellison Reininger and Jaywill Sands
Defendant: Apple, Inc. and AT&T Corp.
Case Number: 5:2010cv02862
Filed: June 29, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR FINAL SETTLEMENT APPROVAL; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS by Judge Ronald M. Whyte (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
January 14, 2011 71 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND PRETRIAL ORDER 8 NO. 1. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/14/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
November 30, 2010 70 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 2 Extending Time to Respond to Complaints. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/30/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 9, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the Northern District of California are transferred to the Northern District of California, assigned to the Honorable Ronald M. Whyte be part of MDL No. 10-2188 RMW(PVT). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this litigation is renamed "In re: Apple Iphone 4 Products Liability Litigation." (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
October 28, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 64 For Extension of Time to Respond to Second Amended Complaint and Resetting Case Management Conference Pending MDL Transfer. Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/28/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
September 16, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 47 Extending Time to Respond to Complaints. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/16/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
August 5, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 37 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Whyte on 8/5/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
July 13, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Transferring Case to San Jose Division. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 07/13/10. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodlick v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael James Goodlick
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinny Curbelo
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Young
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Antunez
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Stankovitz
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaclyn Badolato
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Lares
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Gilson
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Colver
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Ellison Reininger
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaywill Sands
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Penelope Athene Preovolos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?