Campos et al v. Posh Bakery Holding Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alberto Jorge Campos, Eneyda Mendoza, Elisabeth Vazquez, Francisco Hernandez and Ricardo Lopez
Defendant: Posh Bakery Holding Company, Inc., Jeffrey Ottoveggio and Cheryl Lee
Case Number: 5:2010cv02873
Filed: June 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DISMISSAL re 36 Stipulation filed by Ricardo Lopez. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 24, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MODIFY THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 31 Stipulation filed by Eneyda Mendoza, Elisabeth Vazquez. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 11, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO COMPLETE MEDIATION re 27 Stipulation filed by Posh Bakery Holding Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 28, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DISSOLVING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 4, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 12, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 17 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation filed by Ricardo Lopez, Francisco Hernandez, Eneyda Mendoza, Alberto Jorge Campos, Elisabeth Vazquez. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 7, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 10 Stipulation filed by Posh Bakery Holding Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on September 16, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campos et al v. Posh Bakery Holding Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Jorge Campos
Represented By: Adam Lee Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eneyda Mendoza
Represented By: Adam Lee Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisabeth Vazquez
Represented By: Adam Lee Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Hernandez
Represented By: Adam Lee Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Lopez
Represented By: Adam Lee Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Posh Bakery Holding Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Ottoveggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?