Reflex Packaging, Inc. v. Stephen Gould Corporation
Plaintiff: Reflex Packaging, Inc.
Defendant: Stephen Gould Corporation
Case Number: 5:2010cv02909
Filed: July 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Pursuant to Party Stipulation. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/12/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Extending Deadline to File Dismissal. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/5/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Regarding Dismissal. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/21/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Protective ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 10, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 31 Motion for a Protective Order (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re 34 Proposed Order, filed by Reflex Packaging, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 31, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reflex Packaging, Inc. v. Stephen Gould Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reflex Packaging, Inc.
Represented By: Michael M. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Gould Corporation
Represented By: S. Fey Epling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?