San Francisco Technology, Inc. v. Aero Products International, Inc et al
Plaintiff: San Francisco Technology, Inc.
Defendant: Aero Products International, Inc, BP Lubricants USA Inc, BRH Brands, Inc, Calico Brands, Inc, Cooper Lighting, LLC, Darex LLC, Dexas International Ltd, Dyna-Gro Nutrition Solutions, Fiskars Brands, Inc, Global Concepts, Inc, Homax Products, Inc., Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Krqaco Enterprises LLC, Lixit Corporation, Mead Westvaco Corporation, Nutrition 21 Inc, Oatey Co, Optimum Technologies, Inc, Newell Rubbermaid Inc., Schick Manufacturing, Inc, The Scotts Company LLC, Sterling International, Inc, Vitamin Power Incorporated, Woodstream Corporation and 4-D Design, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv02994
Filed: July 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 455 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on August 4, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 453 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE MOTION HEARING TO ALLOW TIME FOR SETTLEMENT WITH MEADWESTVACO CORPORATION re 451 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/7/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS 180 187 193 203 210 233 280 285 TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND AND GRANTING MOTIONS TO SEVER AND TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on March 16, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT WOODSTREAM CORPORATION'S MOTION 199 TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on March 14, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER GRANTING MOVING DEFENDANTS' MOTION 231 TO STAY DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND TO TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on February 28, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS AGAINST DEFENDANT OATEY COMPANY. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on January 25, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT DEXAS INTERNATIONAL LTD.'S MOTION 214 TO SEVER AND TRANSFER VENUE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on January 19, 2011.
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT NEWELL RUBBERMAID INC.'S MOTION TO SEVER AND TRANSFER VENUE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on January 14, 2011.
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 393 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF OPTIMUM TECHNOLOGIES INC. re 391 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/3/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 390 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on December 3, 2010.
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on November 30, 2010.
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER GRANTING 289 DEFENDANT SCHICK MANUFACTURING, INC.'S MOTION TO TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/16/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER GRANTING 341 , 344 DEFENDANT DEXAS INTERANTIONAL LTD'S REQUEST FOR COUNSEL TO PARTICIPATE IN INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MOTION HEARING BY TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/4/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER GRANTING 308 DEFENDANT KRACO ENTERPRISES LLC'S REQUEST FOR COUNSEL TO PARTICIPATE IN INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/14/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 295 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SEVER KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION re 248 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/27/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER (AS MODIFIED) GRANTING 269 DEFENDANT GLOBAL CONCEPTS LIMITED INC.'S REQUEST FOR COUNSEL TO PARTICIPATE IN INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/27/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 267 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SEVERANCE OF CLAIMS AGAINST BRK BRANDS, INC. re 194 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/9/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER APPROVING 202 STIPULATION AS TO CONSOLIDATED MOTION HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT). All pending motions and the case management conference are RESET for 11/19/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/20/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 204 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR DEFENDANT AERO re 160 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/3/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 104 staying case as to Sterling International, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/17/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 60 Staying Case With Respect to Fiskars Brands, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/11/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Francisco Technology, Inc. v. Aero Products International, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Francisco Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Harlan Fingerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aero Products International, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Lubricants USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRH Brands, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calico Brands, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Lighting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darex LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexas International Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dyna-Gro Nutrition Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiskars Brands, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Concepts, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homax Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly-Clark Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krqaco Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lixit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mead Westvaco Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutrition 21 Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oatey Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optimum Technologies, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newell Rubbermaid Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schick Manufacturing, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Scotts Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling International, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vitamin Power Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodstream Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4-D Design, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?