West v. Quality Gold, Inc.

Plaintiff: Trent West
Defendant: Quality Gold, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv03124
Filed: July 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER GRANTING 155 Stipulated Dismissal of all Claims with Prejudice filed by Quality Gold, Inc., ***Deadlines terminated. 155 Stipulation, filed by Quality Gold, Inc. Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Defendant and Coun terclaimant Quality Gold, Inc., Third-Party Defendant Jewelry Innovations, Inc., and Third-Party Defendant Glenn Miller, by and through their respective counsel of record, stipulate that all claims between them in this action are hereby dismissed wit h prejudice. Each party shall bear its/his own costs and attorneys' fees. The Clerk shall close this file. Motions terminated: 151 MOTION for Reconsideration OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY (Dkt. No. 146) filed by Trent West. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/28/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER RE: BANKRUPTCY STAY. This action is STAYED as to all claims asserted against GMA. The action shall proceed on all other claims pursuant to the current case schedule. However, any party seeking a stay of this entire action may file an administ rative motion for such relief pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11, which the court will consider upon expiration of the time for provided for written opposition. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/16/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 INTERIM ORDER re 129 , 130 Motion to Seal and Stipulation to Remove Documents from the Docket. Defendant's declaration(s) re sealing due by 6/21/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/14/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER GRANTING 118 Notice (Other) of Withdrawal of McPharlin Sprinkles & Thomas LLP as Counsel as to GMA, Inc., Glenn A. Miller. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/9/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER DENYING 73 MILLER'S MOTION TO DISMISS, ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, AND ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND DENYING 83 JII'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/28/2012. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Order by Hon. Edward J. Davila granting in part and denying in part 103 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER VACATING 96 Order Striking Plaintiff's Opposition and REINSTATING 93 West's Administrative Motion to File Document Under Seal. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER DENYING 93 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Trent West AS MOOT and STRIKING Plaintiff's late-filed Opposition to JII's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/10/12. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Reschedule the Case Management Conferences and Hearings on Pending Motions re (88 in 5:10-cv-03124-EJD), (27 in 5:11-cv-02531-EJD) Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to (73 in 5:10-cv-03124-EJD) MOTION to Dismiss, (11 in 5:1 1-cv-02531-EJD) MOTION to Dismiss , Stay, or Transfer. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/16/2012. Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2012 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/15/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS OF UNITED STATES PATENT NOS. 6,928,734 AND 7,032,314. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/16/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING THE CASE SCHEDULE re 41 . Markman hearing set for 6/13/2011 09:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/11/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 24 , Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/25/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RELATING CASES re 3 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/4/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. Quality Gold, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trent West
Represented By: Edward Vincent King, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Gold, Inc.
Represented By: Ian K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?