Perry et al v. NationaL Default Servicing Corporation (NDSC) et al

Plaintiff: Robet Perry and Tammy M Rey
Defendant: NationaL Default Servicing Corporation (NDSC), Kondaur Capital Corporation, EMC Mortgage Corporation, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Service, Inc. and and all persons unknown claiming any legal or equitable right, title, estate, lien or interest in the property described in the Complaint adverse to Plaintiffs' title, or any Cloud Upon Plaintif
Case Number: 5:2010cv03167
Filed: July 20, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Benito
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 4 Motion to Dismiss TILA Claim; granting 15 Motion to Dismiss TILA Claim; and Remanding Remaining Claims. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
November 18, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule on Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/18/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
September 28, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED ORDER RE-SETTING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/28/10. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
August 24, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 30 Motion to Stay (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 20, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Preliminary Injunction Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 08/20/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 5, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion for TRO by Judge Lucy H. Koh (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry et al v. NationaL Default Servicing Corporation (NDSC) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robet Perry
Represented By: William Blackford Look, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy M Rey
Represented By: William Blackford Look, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NationaL Default Servicing Corporation (NDSC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kondaur Capital Corporation
Represented By: Peter M Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: and all persons unknown claiming any legal or equitable right, title, estate, lien or interest in the property described in the Complaint adverse to Plaintiffs' title, or any Cloud Upon Plaintif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?