Danielle Reyas v. Google, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Danielle Reyas
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv03215
Filed: July 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2010 Filing 18 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/13/2010 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 9/13/2010). The Court to issue further order following conference. (Court Reporter Unreported.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/13/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 17 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING TIME FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 7, 2010 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Avi Melech Kreitenberg - Scott A. Kamber (Kreitenberg, Avi) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 3, 2010 Pursuant to Signed Related Case Order ( 14 ). Case reassigned to District Judge James Ware for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all discovery matters. Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull no longer assigned to the case. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR FILING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT in case 5:10-cv-02187-JW; denying (14) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:10-md-02184-JW. Deadline to file Joint Case Management Conference statement due by 9/7/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/2/2010. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 Related cases: Create association to 5:10-md-02184-JW. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RELATING CASE. The Court finds that 5:10-md-02184-JW and C 10-02187 JW, 5:10-cv-03215-PVT, 5:10-cv-03272-PVT, 5:10-cv-03297-PVT, 5:10-cv-03715-PVT ARE RELATED. Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/3/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 13 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/5/2010. Case Management Conference set for 10/12/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Judge Trumbull Standing Order for Civil Practice in Assigned Cases for all Purposes, # 2 Standing Order Regarding Case Management in Civil Cases for all San Jose Judges, # 3 Standing Orders for All Judges of the Northern District of California) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Clerk mailed ADR Scheduling Order and Court Handouts to attorney of record for Danielle Reyas (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 22, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 22, 2010 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:10-cv-03886. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 7/23/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. This matter is before the Court on the Parties' Joint Stipulation to Transfer Venue 10 . Having reviewed the matter, the Court has determined that it should be GRANTED. The Clerk is hereby directed to TRANSFER this matter in its entirety to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California, San Jose Division. All pretrial deadlines SHALL be STAYED pending the JPML's resolution of whether the Google Wi-Fi Cases, and all subsequently-filed related actions, should be transferred to a single judicial district for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (See attached Order for further information). (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (Attachments: # 1 CV-22 Transmittal Letter - Civil Case Transfer Out) (jp) Modified on 8/26/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2010 Filing 10 STIPULATION to transfer Venue to United States District Court for the Northern District of California, San Jose Division This class action lawsuit was filed on 5/24/10, and involves allegations that Defendant Google, Inc., "Street View" re: private information filed by plaintiff Danielle Reyas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order on Joint Stipulation to Transfer Venue)(Kreitenberg, Avi) Modified on 8/26/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2010 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Avi Melech Kreitenberg on behalf of Plaintiff Danielle Reyas (Kreitenberg, Avi)
June 16, 2010 Filing 8 PDF DOCUMENTS ATTACHED TO DOCKET RE LOCAL RULE 3-2. The following PDF Documents were attached to the Court docket on 6/16/10: Notice of Assignment, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet. (mg)
June 16, 2010 Filing 7 PDF DOCUMENTS RECEIVED RE LOCAL RULE 3-2. The following PDF Documents were received by the Court on 6/16/10: Notice of Assignment, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet. (mg)
June 14, 2010 Filing 6 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL RULE 3-2 held before Judge Audrey B. Collins: PLAINTIFF is reminded that all manually filed civil initiating documents shall be e-mailed to the Court within 24 hours of their filing with the Court in PDF format only. PLAINTIFF is hereby ordered to e-mail PDF copies of the Notice of Assignment, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet to the Civil Intake e-mail address for the appropriate Court Division within 24 hours of the issuance of this order. Failure to do so will result in a hearing before this Court and imposition of sanctions pursuant to Local Rule 83-7(a). (mg)
June 4, 2010 Filing 5 CLERKS E-MAIL RE LOCAL RULE 3-2 TO COUNSEL on 6/4/10 addressed to idoust@sbcglobal.net. COURT REQUIRES YOUR IMMEDIATE RESPONSE. Pursuant to Local Rule 3-2, you are required to e-mail, within 24 hours of filing, a Filed stamped copy of your complaint and other civil case initiating documents, in PDF format to the Court. To date, we have not received the PDF images of your filing. Please do so within 24 hours or this matter will be referred to the Chief Judge for further proceedings. (mg)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (kbr)
May 24, 2010 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
May 24, 2010 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Danielle Reyas. (et) (ds).
May 24, 2010 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendant Google, Inc. (et)
May 24, 2010 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendant Google, Inc. Case assigned to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Danielle Reyas. (et) Modified on 5/25/2010 (et). (ds). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2010: # 1 Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Ntc of Asgmt) (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Danielle Reyas v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Reyas
Represented By: Ilana Doust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?