Benitti v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Rick Benitti
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv03297
Filed: July 27, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Barbara
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2010 12 Featured Case ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. On or before 9/27/2010, Plaintiffs shall file their motions for appointment of Lead Interim Counsel under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g) and any stipulation regarding consolidation of cases, including tag along cases. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, these motions will be taken under submission for consideration without oral argument. On or before 11/8/2010, Plaintiffs shall file a Master Consolidated Complaint that includes all claims against Defendant Google, both Federal and State. The Court will set an interim Case Management Conference once the Master Consolidated Complaint is filed. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/14/210. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
September 13, 2010 11 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/13/2010 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 9/13/2010). The Court to issue further order following conference. (Court Reporter Unreported.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/13/2010)
September 9, 2010 10 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING TIME FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 3, 2010 Pursuant to Signed Related Case Order ( 8 ). Case reassigned to District Judge James Ware for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all discovery matters. Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull no longer assigned to the case. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 9 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR FILING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT in case 5:10-cv-02187-JW; denying (14) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:10-md-02184-JW. Deadline to file Joint Case Management Conference statement due by 9/7/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/2/2010. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 8 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASE. The Court finds that 5:10-md-02184-JW and C 10-02187 JW, 5:10-cv-03215-PVT, 5:10-cv-03272-PVT, 5:10-cv-03297-PVT, 5:10-cv-03715-PVT ARE RELATED. Related cases: Create association to 5:10-md-02184-JW. Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motions terminated: 5 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Rick Benitti. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/3/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
August 25, 2010 7 (Proposed) Order Granting Administrative Motion to Relate the Benitti Case to (10-2187JW) by Rick Benitti. (Gignac, J. Paul) (Filed on 8/25/2010) Modified on 8/26/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2010 6 Declaration of J. Paul Gignac in Support of Administrative Motion to Relate the Benitti Case to (10-2187JW) re ( 5 ) filed by Rick Benitti. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Complaint) (Gignac, J. Paul) (Filed on 8/25/2010) Text modified and linkage added on 8/26/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/26/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2010 5 Administrative Motion to Relate the Benitti Case to C10-2187 JW Benitti is a potential "tag-along action" in the matter of In re: Google, Inc., Street View Electronic Communications Litigation, MDL No. 2184 JW Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 filed by Benitti (Filed on 8/25/2010) Modified on 8/26/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 8/26/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 27, 2010 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/12/2010. Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2010: # 1 Judge Trumbull Standing Order for Civil Practice in Assigned Cases for all Purposes, # 2 Standing Order Regarding Case Management in Civil Cases for all San Jose Judges, # 3 Standing Orders for All Judges of the Northern District of California) (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2010 3 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010) (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2010 2 Certification of Interested Parties and Entities by Rick Benitti (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010) (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2010 1 Class Action COMPLAINT for (1) Violation of the Federal Wiretap Act 18 U.S.C. § 2511; (2) Declaratory Relief Under The declaratory Judgment Act 28 U.S.C. § 2201; (3) Violation of California Business and Professions Code § 17200; and (4) Invasion of Privacy (Summons Issued; jury demand; against Google, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611007782). Filed by Rick Benitti. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010) Modified on 7/28/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF). (bw, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benitti v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Benitti
Represented By: J. Paul Gignac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?