Vasquez et al v. Cal Western Reconveyance Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Francisco Vasquez and Jose Vasquez
Defendant: Cal Western Reconveyance Corporation, US Bank National as trustee, First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-FF-10, Mortgage Pass, American Title Company, Home Loan Sevices, Inc., SPS/Select Portofolio Servicing, Inc., Darrell Wallace and Wrigth, Finlay & Zak, LLP
Case Number: 5:2010cv03411
Filed: August 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Benito
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER LIFTING STAY AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS' LETTER REQUEST TO SERVE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/18/2011. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/13/2010. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING 3 4 MOTIONS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DENYING 10 MOTION FOR STAY OF ENFORCEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/14/2010. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL FOR RELATED CASE CONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on August 9, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vasquez et al v. Cal Western Reconveyance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal Western Reconveyance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National as trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-FF-10, Mortgage Pass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Loan Sevices, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPS/Select Portofolio Servicing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wrigth, Finlay & Zak, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?