Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. et al v. A10 Networks, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. and Foundry Networks, LLC
Defendant: A10 Networks, Inc., Lee Chen, Rajkumar Jalan, Ron Szeto and David Cheung
Case Number: 5:2010cv03428
Filed: August 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1030 ORDER RE: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on October 9, 2013. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1026 REVISED STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT, re 1024 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 6/10/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1008 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 17, 2013. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1007 ORDER ALLOWING ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT INTO COURTROOM, granting 1006 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 5/16/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013) Modified on 5/17/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/17/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 998 ORDER RE SCOPE OF RETRIAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 986 Motion ; denying 991 Motion to Strike (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 935 ORDER RE SCOPE OF NEW TRIAL re 914 MOTION Defendants A10 and Lee Chen's Motion for Entry of Judgment as to Brocade's Intentional Interference Punitive Damages Claim or, in the Alternative, for a Seprate Trial as to Patent Damages filed by Lee Chen, A10 Networks, Inc., 920 Notice (Other), filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Foundry Networks, LLC. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 29, 2013. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 918 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO SEAL, denying 510 , 512 , 521 , 536 , 541 , 546 , 549 , 563 , 567 , 575 , 584 , 586 , 595 and 596 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 3/26/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 917 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL EXHIBITS A AND B TO MINGRONE DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.'S AND FOUNDRY NETWORKS, LLC'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT A10 NETWORKS, INC.'S UNAUTHORIZED OBJECTIONS (D.I. 570) TO BROCADES IDENTIFICATION OF CLAIMS FOR TRIAL, granting-in-part 575 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 3/25/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 910 ORDER RE: RETRIAL PROCEDURES, re: 906 , 907 , 908 : Jury Trial set for 5/20/2013, 5/21/2013 and 5/22/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 3/6/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 897 ORDER RE BROCADE'S MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION RE TRADE SECRETS, re 848 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 2/21/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 881 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO STAY OR TO MODIFY PERMANENT INJUNCTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 833 Motion to Stay; denying 837 Motion to Stay; granting in part and denying in part 852 Motion to Stay (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 849 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OF SALES RECORDS AND DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 782 Motion Entry of Judgment, Production, Supplemental Damages; denying 785 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 838 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART AND DENYING-IN-PART MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 775 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 794 Administrative Motion to File Under S eal; granting in part and denying in part 801 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 807 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 812 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 830 ORDER GRANTING BROCADE'S MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION RE PATENT INFRINGEMENT re 783 MOTION for Permanent Injunction PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Foundry Networks, LLC. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 10, 2013. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 825 ORDER SOLICITING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING IN LIGHT OF THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT'S RECENT DECISION. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on November 14, 2012. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 821 ORDER ALLOWING ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT INTO COURTROOM re 820 Proposed Order filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Foundry Networks, LLC. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on November 7, 2012. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2012)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 792 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME by Judge Paul S. Grewal, denying 787 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 9/26/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 781 ORDER GRANTING BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL re 452 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS BROCADE COMMUNIC ATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.S AND FOUNDRY NETWORKS, LLCS IDENTIFICATION OF PATENT CLAIMS, TRADE SECRETS, AND COPYRIGHT CLAIMS filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Foundry Networks, LLC. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 18, 2012. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 667 ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND DAUBERT MOTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 585 587 Motions in Limine (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
July 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 644 ORDER GRANTING BROCADES MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND DENYING A10S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, granting 578 Motion for Reconsideration re Copyright Claim Pertaining to Automation Test Code filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Foundry Networks, LLC. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 7/8/2012 (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2012).
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 632 FURTHER CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER re 620 Brief, filed by A10 Networks, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on July 5, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 623 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT 7/3/2012 STATUS CONFERENCE, granting 621 Letter filed by Lee Chen, Steve Hwang, Ron Szeto, A10 Networks, Inc., Rajkumar Jalan. (Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance.). Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 7/2/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 615 Pretrial Conference ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/27/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012) Modified on 6/28/2012 (lhklc1, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 608 ORDER re Trial Date. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/26/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Invalidity Declaratory Relief Counterclaim and Invalidity Affirmative Defense Regarding U.S. Patent Nos. 7,454,500; 7,581,009; 7,558,195; and 7,774,833. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/18/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 579 ORDER Granting Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/13/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 571 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part A10's Motion for Summary Judgment.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/12/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 566 Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/11/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 556 ORDER re June 7, 2012 Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/5/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 534 ORDER ALLOWING ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT INTO COURTROOM, granting 532 Proposed Order filed by Lee Chen, Steve Hwang, Ron Szeto, A10 Networks, Inc., Rajkumar Jalan. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 5/17/2012. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ORDER ALLOWING ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT INTO COURTROOM, granting 531 Proposed Order filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 5/14/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 523 ORDER re Dismissal of Defendant David Cheung. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/8/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT A10 NETWORKS REQUEST TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 5/1/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 502 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 500 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER Continuing CMC; Denying A10's Request for Further Narrowing by April 25, 2012. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/3/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 486 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 484 Motion for Leave to File.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 482 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 474 Motion to Continue.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 480 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 473 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES, FORENSIC INSPECTION PROTOCOL, VACATING CONFERENCE, AND DISCOVERY SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/7/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER re: Case Management. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/30/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER re: Case Management. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/27/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2012)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER re: Forensic Inspection. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/18/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 423 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 424 Motion to Compel. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 436 Correction of Docket # 435 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 222 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 225 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 231 Motion for Summary Judgment. The only change is that the date of signature was corrected from January 6, 2011, to January 6, 2012. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/6/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER Requiring A10 to Comply with Civil Local Rule 79-5(d). Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/5/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 418 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 408 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 413 Stipulated ORDER Regarding Parties' Proposed Claim Constructions. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/19/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER re (405 in 5:10-cv-03428-LHK) Proposed Order filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Foundry Networks, LLC. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/16/11. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 401 Order Modifying Protective Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/14/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER ALLOWING ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT INTO COURTROOM. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/12/11. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 363 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; ORDER RELATING CASE by Judge Lucy H. Koh withdrawing 284 Motion to Compel; granting 332 Motion to Relate Case; withdrawing 237 Motion to Compel; withdrawing 244 Motion to Strike ; withdrawing 257 Motion to Strike ; withdrawing 270 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 278 Motion to Compel; withdrawing 282 Motion to Strike CASE 11-CV-05493WHA IS RELATED TO THIS CASE (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER Adopting Amended Protective Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/29/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER Memorializing Agreements. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/22/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY re 319 Letter filed by Liang Han. Counsel is directed to arrange through CourtCall. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/15/11. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER Correcting Scheduling on 252 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/14/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER Resetting Hearing and Case Management Conference for 11/29/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/9/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 286 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending the Due Date for Defendants' Claim Construction Brief. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/3/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011) Modified text on 11/3/2011 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER Regarding Discovery Motions. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/21/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 216 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and Striking Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment on Infringement(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 204 AMENDED ORDER REGARDING APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/9/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER IMPOSING SANCTIONS ON DEFENDANT A10. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/6/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER Appointing Special Master. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/30/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 150 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 102 Motion to Stay; finding as moot 105 Motion to Compel; denying 108 Motion to Qualify Expert Kevin Jeffay Under the Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 138 Motion for Sanctions; granting 157 Motion to Order A10 to File Confidential Information Under Seal; granting 164 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER Setting Hearing on August 12, 2011 at 10:30 a.m. on All Pending Motions. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/5/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting 113 Motion to File Declaration for in Camera Review. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 96 Motion to Change Schedule, as Modified.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, AS MODIFIED. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/27/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION AND ORDER (as modified) re 87 Proposed Order, filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Foundry Networks, LLC Tutorial Hearing set for 12/12/2011 12:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Claims Construction Hearing set for 12/ 19/2011 12:00 PM. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/15/2012 02:00 PM. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/2/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/20/2012 02:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 7/16/2012 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 7/16/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/9/11. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Regarding Joint Case Management Statement. Statement Due by April 27, 2011 at 11 a.m. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/25/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Claims Construction Hearing set for 10/28/2011 02:00 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 10/21/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/24/11. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion to Dismiss. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Continuing Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference from February 17, 2011 to April 28, 2011. Signed by Judge Koh on 2/14/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 50 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Approving Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/06/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. et al v. A10 Networks, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Fabio Elia Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foundry Networks, LLC
Represented By: Fabio Elia Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A10 Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajkumar Jalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Szeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?