Cortez v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Oscar Munoz Cortez
Defendant: Jeffrey Lynn Johnson, Roof Guard Roofing Company, Inc. and Roof Guard Company, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv03479
Filed: August 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Regarding Joint Case Management Statement and Resetting Case Management Conference for June 8, 2011 at 2 p.m. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/18/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Requiring Submission of Joint Case Management Statement by April 15, 2011. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/7/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2011)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Based upon the parties' statement in 11 their Joint Case Management Statement, this case was reassigned to this Court for all purposes including trial. Nevertheless, all parties shall, no la ter than April 5, 2011, file either (1) a Consent to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge or (2) a Declination to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge. See N.D. Cal. Civ. R. 7 3-1. The consent and declination forms are available at the Clerks Office and may also be obtained from the courts website at http://www.cand.uscourts.gov. In addition, an initial case management conference is set for April 19, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2, United States District Court, 280 South First Street, San Jose, California. The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Statement no later than April 12, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/25/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Referring Case for Reassignment to United States Magistrate Judge per Parties' Consent. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/19/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cortez v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Munoz Cortez
Represented By: James Dal Bon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Lynn Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roof Guard Roofing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roof Guard Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?