Zions Bancorporation v. U.S. Ethernet Innovations LLC
Plaintiff: Zions Bancorporation
Defendant: U.S. Ethernet Innovations LLC
Intervenor: Intel Corporation
Case Number: 5:2010cv03481
Filed: August 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER GRANTING 170 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/5/2015. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 BRIEFING ORDER Re 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/16/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER APPOINTING TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/8/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES 3:13-cv-02262 NC with 4:10-cv-03481 CW. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/20/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER DENYING AT&T DEFENDANTS ( 76 , 134 in Case No. 10-5254) MOTIONS TO DISMISS, DENYING RENEWED REQUEST TO SEVER CLAIMS AGAINST INTERVENORS AND TO SEVER AND STAY CLAIMS AGAINST ACER DEFENDANTS, AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE BRIEFS ADDRESSING STAY OF CLAIMS AGAINST AT&T DEFENDANTS AND ZIONS BANCORPORATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/7/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 26, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' L.R. 7-11 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION IN CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 6, 2012. (mmclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO PROVIDE CHAMBERS COPY OF OPERATIVE PLEADINGS. Parties are directed to provide operative pleadings to the Court no later than September 28, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 17, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Hon. Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/10/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER terminating appointment of technical advisor. Signed by Judge James Ware on August 30, 2012. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 133 SECOND CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge James Ware on August 29, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING re (621 in 5:10-cv-03724-JW) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Equipment for Claim Construction Hearing filed by Intel Corporation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/2/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING MARKMAN HEARING Supplemental Claim Construction Brief due by 4/18/2012. Markman hearing set for 5/3/2012 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/2/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (595 in 5:10-cv-03724-JW) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RELATING TO ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF PURSUANT TO FIRST CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER filed by U.S. Ethernet Innovations, LLC. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/16/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (593 in 5:10-cv-03724-JW) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Relating to Enlargement of Time to File Supplemental Briefing filed by Intel Corporation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/5/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 FIRST CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 31, 2012. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER re (95 in 5:10-cv-03481-JW) Notice (Other) filed by U.S. Ethernet Innovations LLC. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 20, 2012. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER requiring submission of prosecution history. Signed by Judge James Ware on October 24, 2011. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER APPOINTING TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Judge James Ware on October 17, 2011. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER ADVANCING MARKMAN HEARING Markman hearing set for 10/21/2011 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/4/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY REFERRAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/15/11. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER RE JUNE 2, 2011 522 AND JUNE 7, 2011 525 DISCOVERY LETTERS. Signed by Judge Beeler on 7/8/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Extend Time to File Joint Case Management Conference Statement re (257 in 5:10-cv-05254-JW) Stipulation, (44 in 5:10-cv-03481-JW) Stipulation, (501 in 5:10-cv-03724-JW) Stipulation. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 3/23/2011. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/21/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zions Bancorporation v. U.S. Ethernet Innovations LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zions Bancorporation
Represented By: Eric Harold Weisblatt
Represented By: Anthony H. Son, Esq.
Represented By: Edward Vincent King, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Ethernet Innovations LLC
Represented By: Luke O Brooks
Represented By: John K. Grant
Represented By: John C. Herman
Represented By: Peter M Jones
Represented By: Ryan K. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Intel Corporation
Represented By: Seth McCarthy Sproul
Represented By: Garland T. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?