Apple, Inc v. Devine et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Apple, Inc
Defendant: Paul Shin Devine and CPK Engineering, Inc
Case Number: 5:2010cv03563
Filed: August 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Judge James Ware no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 4/25/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Staying Case re 19 Stipulation.***3/28/2011 Case Management Conference Deadlines terminated. The Clerk of Court shall administratively close this file. Within ten (10) days of the close of the related criminal proceedings, either party may move to have the case reopened. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/14/2011.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 9, 2011 Filing 19 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Staying this Case and Continuing Responsive Pleading Obligation by Paul Shin Devine. (Ramsey, Ismail) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 18 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Conference Statement due 3/18/2011. Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
December 6, 2010 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery purposes. Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull no longer assigned to the case. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
November 4, 2010 Pursuant to Signed Related Case Order ( 17 ). Case reassigned to Judge James Ware for all further proceedings. Judge Jeremy Fogel no longer assigned to the case. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RELATED CASE ORDER. CR-10-00603-JW USA vs Paul Devine, et.al and CV-10-03563-JF Apple Inc. vs Paul Devine, et.al ARE RELATED as defined by Crim. L.R. 8-1(b). Pursuant to Crim. L.R. 8-1(e), the Clerk of Court is ordered to reassign the later-filed action to the undersigned. Counsel are instructed that all future filings are to bear the initials __JW__ immediately after the case number. All matters presently scheduled for hearing in the reassigned case(s) are vacated and must be renoticed for hearing before the undersigned. Signed by Judge Hon. James Ware on 11/4/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
October 12, 2010 Filing 16 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
September 30, 2010 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge; Information Regarding Electronic Case Filing; Apple Inc.'s Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement served on Paul S. Devine on August 25, 2010, filed by Apple, Inc. (Bunzel, Sharon) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 30, 2010 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge; Information Regarding Electronic Case Filing; Apple Inc.'s Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement served on CPK Engineering, Inc. on August 25, 2010, filed by Apple, Inc. (Bunzel, Sharon) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeremy Fogel for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 09/29/2010. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 27, 2010 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 15, 2010 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mail re 10 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Apple, Inc (Bunzel, Sharon) (Filed on 9/15/2010) Modified on 9/15/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2010 Filing 10 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Apple, Inc (Bunzel, Sharon) (Filed on 9/15/2010) Modified on 9/15/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2010 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 8 Certificate of Interested Entities, 6 Stipulation, 7 Certificate of Interested Entities Certificate of Service By Mailby Apple, Inc (Bunzel, Sharon) (Filed on 9/13/2010) Modified on 9/15/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2010 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement Rule 7.1 by Apple, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Apple Inc. for Apple, Inc. Apple Inc.'s (Bunzel, Sharon) (Filed on 9/13/2010) Text modified on 9/15/2010, incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2010 Filing 7 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Apple, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Apple Inc. for Apple, Inc. (Bunzel, Sharon) (Filed on 9/13/2010) Modified on 9/15/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2010 Filing 6 Stipulation Continuing Paul S. Devine's Obligation to File A Responsive Pleading Under F.R.C.P. 12 by Apple, Inc. (Bunzel, Sharon) (Filed on 9/13/2010) Modified on 9/15/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2010 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CPK Engineering, Inc, Paul Shin Devine. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 16, 2010 Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Paul Shin Devine by Apple, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 13, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2010. Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Judge Trumbull Standing Order for Civil Practice in Assigned Cases for all Purposes, # 2 Standing Order Regarding Case Management in Civil Cases for all San Jose Judges, # 3 Standing Orders for All Judges of the Northern District of California) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Paul Shin Devine. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CPK Engineering, Inc, Paul Shin Devine ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611007903). Filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B to Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C to Complaint, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apple, Inc v. Devine et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apple, Inc
Represented By: Sharon M. Bunzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Shin Devine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPK Engineering, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?