Van Valin et al v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

A consumer privacy lawsuit against Google, Inc. over the company's Google Street View product, originally filed in federal court in Oregon, was transferred to federal court in the Northern District of California. The case was filed by plaintiffs in Oregon and Washington.

Plaintiff: Vicki Van Valin and Neil Mertz
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv03641
Filed: September 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1332cl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2010 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery purposes. Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull no longer assigned to the case (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H. Rubin Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Defendant Google Inc., David H. Kramer, Michael H. Rubin, Bart E. Volkmer and Caroline E. Wilson (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of Oregon; Case Number 3:10-cv-00557. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 17, 2010 Filing 26 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER Dated 8/17/10 transferring this case to the USDC for the Northern District of California at San Jose pursuant to MDL #2184, and assigned to the Honorable James Ware. Signed and sealed 8/18/10 by Cinda Vargas, Deputy Clerk, USDC Northern District of California.
August 17, 2010 Filing 25 PRELIMINARY CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER dated 8/17/10. This case to be transferred to the Northern District of California before the Honorable James Ware for consolidated pretrial proceedings upon receipt of the certified copy of this order from the transferee court along with the newly assigned case number in that district.Signed by John G. Heyburn, II, Chairman of the MDL Panel (mkk)
August 9, 2010 ***NON-PUBLIC******Term Transcript Deadlines. These deadlines have passed. (dls) Modified on 9/8/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: GRANTING Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition 23 . Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
July 14, 2010 ***NON-PUBLIC****** Case Flags Edited. Substitute law clerk Kara Ellis with Jessica Murphy. (mjp) Modified on 9/8/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2010 ***NON-PUBLIC****** Case Flags Edited. Law Clerk Kara Ellis added. (mjp) Modified on 9/8/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2010 Filing 23 Stipulated Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Cooper, Brooks)
July 7, 2010 Filing 22 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (eo)
June 22, 2010 ***NON-PUBLIC****** Case Flags Edited. case stayed flag set. (da) Modified on 9/8/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Stay Pretrial Deadlines, # 19 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (da)
June 21, 2010 Filing 20 Declaration of David J. Burman. Filed by Google, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Stay 19 .) (Markley, Julia)
June 21, 2010 Filing 19 Unopposed Motion for Stay Pretrial Deadlines. Filed by Google, Inc.. (Markley, Julia)
June 9, 2010 Filing 18 Notice OF JPML FILING Filed by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Aldisert, Robert)
June 4, 2010 Filing 17 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Oral Argument held on 5/19/10 before Judge Michael W. Mosman, Court Reporter Bonita J. Shumway, telephone number 503-326-8188. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 6/14/2010. Redaction Request due 6/28/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/7/2010. (Shumway, Bonita)
June 3, 2010 Filing 16 Order - Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Susan D. Fahringer for Google, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 33472 issued. Signed on 6/2/2010 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (ecp)
June 3, 2010 Filing 15 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 5/24/10 before Judge Michael W. Mosman, Court Reporter Bonita J. Shumway, telephone number 503-326-8188. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 6/14/2010. Redaction Request due 6/28/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/7/2010. (Shumway, Bonita)
June 2, 2010 Filing 13 Amended Complaint (CLASS ACTION ALLEGATION COMPLAINT).Filed by Vicki Van Valin, Neil Mertz against Google, Inc.. (Klingbeil, Rick)
June 1, 2010 Filing 14 Order Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of David J. Burman for Google, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 33677 issued. Signed on 6/1/10 by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (mkk)
May 24, 2010 Filing 12 MINUTES of Proceedings: Oral argument held. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court GRANTS IN PART Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (#3). The parties will confer and submit a proposed written order. Rick Klingbeil present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Robert L. Aldisert and David Burman present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. Judge Michael W. Mosman presiding. (dls)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: Granting Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order 3 . Signed on 5/24/10 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (mkk)
May 24, 2010 Filing 10 Declaration of Alexander Stamos. Filed by Google, Inc.. (Related document(s): Response to Motion 9 .) (Aldisert, Robert)
May 24, 2010 Filing 9 Response to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction 3 . Filed by Google, Inc.. (Aldisert, Robert)
May 21, 2010 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by Google, Inc.. (Aldisert, Robert)
May 21, 2010 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance Filed by Google, Inc. (Aldisert, Robert)
May 19, 2010 Filing 6 MINUTES of Proceedings: Oral argument held on plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction 3 . The parties have reached a temporary agreement. Order RESETTING Oral Argument for 5/24/2010 at 9:30 AM in Portland before Judge Michael W. Mosman. Rick Klingbeil pesent as counsel for plaintiff. Robert Aldisert and Julia Markley present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. Judge Michael W. Mosman presiding. (mja)
May 19, 2010 Filing 5 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman regarding Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, # 3 . Oral Argument is set for 5/19/2010 at 03:00PM in Judge Mosman's Courtroom before Judge Michael W. Mosman. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (da)
May 18, 2010 ***NON-PUBLIC****** Case Flags Edited. Judge Mosman back-up flag set - Judge Haggerty back-up flag cleared. (da) Modified on 9/8/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2010 ***NON-PUBLIC****** Case Flags Edited. Judge Haggerty back-up Judge flag set. (da) Modified on 9/8/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2010 Filing 4 Declaration of Rick Klingbeil in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Vicki Van Valin, Neil Mertz. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 3 .) (Klingbeil, Rick)
May 18, 2010 Filing 3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Vicki Van Valin, Neil Mertz. (Klingbeil, Rick)
May 18, 2010 ***NON-PUBLIC****** Case Flags Edited. law clerk Anderson flag set. (da) Modified on 9/8/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2010 Filing 2 Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. Discovery is to be completed by 9/14/2010. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/14/2010. Pretrial Order is due by 10/14/2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (mkk)
May 17, 2010 Summons Issued to Google, Inc. (mkk)
May 17, 2010 Filing 1 Class Action Allegation Complaint. Filing Fee in amount of $350 collected. Receipt No. 33429 issued. Summons issued to Defendant. Jury Trial Requested.Filed by Vicki Van Valin and Neil Mertz against Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mkk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Valin et al v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Van Valin
Represented By: Brooks Franklin Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Mertz
Represented By: Brooks Franklin Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L. Aldisert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?