CARTER et al v. GOOGLE, INC. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Stephanie Carter and Russell Carter
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv03642
Filed: August 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2511
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2010 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery purposes. Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull no longer assigned to the case (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
September 13, 2010 Filing 18 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/13/2010 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 9/13/2010). The Court to issue further order following conference. (Court Reporter Unreported.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/13/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H. Rubin Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Defendant Google Inc., David H. Kramer, Michael H. Rubin, Bart E. Volkmer and Caroline E. Wilson (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR FILING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT in case 5:10-cv-02187-JW; denying (14) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:10-md-02184-JW. Deadline to file Joint Case Management Conference statement due by 9/7/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/2/2010. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 15 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2010. Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:10-cv-02649. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 20, 2010 Filing 13 Certified Copy of Order from Northern District of California, ORDERING THIS ACTION IS TRANSFERRED TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THIS LITIGATION IS RENAMED "IN RE: GOOGLE INC. STREET VIEW ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS LITIGATION." (sg, )
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ALL PRETRIAL DEADLINES SHALL BE STAYED PENDING THE JPML'S RESOLUTION OF WHETHER THE GOOGLE WIFI CASES, AND ALL SUBSEQUENTLY-FILED RELATED ACTION, SHOULD BE TRANSFERRED TO A SINGLE JUDICIAL DISTRICT FOR CORRDINATED OR CONSOLIDATED PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS; IN THE EVENT THAT THE JPML DENIES TRANFER OF THE GOOGLE WIFI CASES, AND ALL SUBSEQUENTLY-FILED ACTIONS, TO A SINGLE JUDICIAL DISTRICT, GOOGLE SHALL HAVE 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THE ORDER DENYING TRANSFER TO PLEAD, ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND IN THE EVENT THAT THE JPML ORDERS THE TRANSFER OF THE GOOGLE WIFI CASES, AND ALL SUBSEQUENTLY-FILED RELATED ACTIONS TO A SINGLE JUDICIAL DISTRICT. GOOGLE SHALL PLEAD ANSWER MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT WITHIN 30 DAYS FROM (a)THE DATE THAT PLAINTIFFS FILES A MASTER CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT IN THE TRANFEREE DISTRICT OR (b)THE DATE THAT IT IS RESOLVED BY THE TRANSFEREE COURT AND/OR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS AND GOOGLE THAT NO MASTER CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT WILL BE FILED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 7/26/2010. 7/26/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
July 16, 2010 Filing 11 Copy Re: Documents (Notice of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument) Filed Before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Regarding MDL 2184. (tjd)
July 2, 2010 Filing 10 Copy Re: Documents (Notice of Appearance) Filed Before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding MDL 2184. (tjd)
June 25, 2010 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. MACORETTA on behalf of RUSSELL CARTER, STEPHANIE CARTER. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(sg, )
June 21, 2010 Filing 8 Copy Re: Documents (Notice of Appearance) Filed before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation re: MDL 2184. (tjd)
June 17, 2010 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by GOOGLE, INC..(JANSSEN, MATTHEW)
June 10, 2010 Filing 6 Re(Motion of Google Inc. for Transfer Of Actions to The Northern District of California)filed before the Judical Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Filed in Hard Copy) (kk, )
June 10, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURENCE Z. SHIEKMAN on behalf of GOOGLE, INC. with Certificate of Service(SHIEKMAN, LAURENCE)
June 10, 2010 Filing 4 NOTICE by GOOGLE, INC. Of Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation Filing (JANSSEN, MATTHEW)
June 10, 2010 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW D. JANSSEN on behalf of GOOGLE, INC. with Certificate of Service(JANSSEN, MATTHEW)
June 7, 2010 Filing 2 Re: (Copy of Motion to Transfer and Consolidate Related Cases) filed before the Judical Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Filed in Hard Copy) (kk, )
June 2, 2010 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by RUSSELL CARTER, STEPHANIE CARTER. (ks, )
June 2, 2010 Summons Issued as to GOOGLE, INC.. Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/3/10 (ks, )
June 2, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GOOGLE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 023966.), filed by STEPHANIE CARTER, RUSSELL CARTER.(ks, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARTER et al v. GOOGLE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Carter
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kodroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Carter
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kodroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew D. Janssen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?