Frett v. Jacquez et al
Plaintiff: Malcolm Frett
Defendant: F. Jacquez, K.L. McGuyer, L. Osborne, S. Manion, J.D. Metcalfe, J. Holben, C. Vasquez and V. Capello
Case Number: 5:2010cv03733
Filed: August 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/6/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Directing Clerk to Re-Issue Summons; Granting 58 Motion for Extension of Time to File by Judge Ronald M. Whyte. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting 40 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/20/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting in Part 54 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 39 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 26 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE; Directing Defendants to File Dispositive Motion or Notice Regarding Such Motion. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/30/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frett v. Jacquez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malcolm Frett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Jacquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.L. McGuyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Manion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.D. Metcalfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Holben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Capello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?