Pina v. Lewis et al
Plaintiff: Pablo P. Pina
Defendant: Lewis, Francisco Jacquez, Brandon, Akin, Barlow, Wilber and Boniti
Case Number: 5:2010cv03784
Filed: August 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 103 Motion to Stay; Granting 124 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER ADDRESSING PLAINTIFF'S PENDING MOTIONS by Judge Ronald M. Whyte. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2015)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 107 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2015)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 85 Motion to Appoint Counsel; Granting 86 Request to Obtain Declarations From Inmates; Granting in Part 100 Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Discovery; Denying 102 Motion to Compel. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 81 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Dispositive Motion. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 71 Motion to Change Time to File a Dispositive Motion, Nunc Pro Tunc. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion for Reconsideration [64, 69]. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER of Partial Dismissal; ORDER OF SERVICE, Directing Defendant to File Dispositive Motion or Notice Regarding Such Motion. Defendants Warden Lewis, C/O Boniti, and the Estate of C/O Boninti are Terminated. Dispositive Motion due by 7/7/2014. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/7/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 53 Motion Motion for Order to Obtain Declarations From Inmate Witnesses; Denying 56 Motion for Entry of Default. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 44 Request for Transfer; Granting 45 Motion for Reconsideration; RE-OPENING CASE; ORDER OF SERVICE. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/27/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Motions terminated: 35 MOTION Requesting Hearing Via Telep hone and Ruling on the Motins filed on 4/18/52012 and 6/11/2012 filed by Pablo P. Pina, 34 MOTION Notice of Motion adn Motion the Court Rule on Motions Filed on 4/18/2012 and 6/11/2012 and that Plaintiff be given Telephone Access to Hearing filed by Pablo P. Pina. Amended Complaint due by 2/22/2013. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/22/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting Motion to Reconsider; Re-Opening Case; Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint by Judge Ronald M. Whyte. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/5/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting Motion to Reconsider; Order Re-Opening Case; Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/17/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/25/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Dismissing Case With Leave to Amend. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/30/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pina v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo P. Pina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Jacquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boniti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?