Leviton Manufacturing Co., Inc. v. Fujian Hongan Electric Co., Ltd et al

Plaintiff: Leviton Manufacturing Co., Inc.
Defendant: Littman Bros. Energy Supplies, Inc., Safety Plus, Royal Pacific Ltd., Interline Brands, Inc., Hardware and Tools Corp., Cost Less Lighting, Inc., Fujian Hongan Electric Co., Ltd, General Protecht Group, Inc., Shanghai Ele Manufacturing Corporation, Zhejiang Trimone Co., Ltd., Zhejiang Easting House Electric Co., Menard, Inc., Garvin Industries, Inc., Central Purchasing, LLC, Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc., Murray Lighting Co.,Inc., Electrical Marketplace, Inc., C& S Sales LLC, The Designers Edge, Inc., Orbit Industries, Inc., W.E. Aubuchon Co., Inc., Westside Wholesale Electric & Lighting, Inc., Westside Electric Wholesale, Inc., Westside Wholesale, Inc., New Aspen Devices Corp., Big Deal Electric Corp., American Ace Supply Inc., U.S.A. Isocanal, Inc., American Electric Depot Inc. and Contractor Lighting & Supply, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv03961
Filed: September 3, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2014 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 135 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of All Remaining Claims without Prejudice filed by Leviton Manufacturing Co., Inc. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/8/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 7, 2014 134 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting 133 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Leviton Manufacturing Co., Inc. Menard, Inc. (a Wisconsin corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/7/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
December 27, 2013 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 129 Voluntary Dismissal of Claims Against Interline Brands, Inc. dba AF Lighting, With Prejudice and Without Costs. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/27/2013. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2013)
December 23, 2013 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 127 Voluntary Dismissal of Claims Against Royal Pacific Ltd. with Prejudice and Without Costs. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/23/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
March 13, 2013 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AGAINST WESTSIDE WHOLESALE ELECTRIC & LIGHTING, INC., WESTSIDE ELECTRIC WHOLESALE, INC., AND WESTSIDE WHOLESALE, INC., WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS re 120 Notice (Other). Westside Wholesale, Inc. (a Cal ifornia corporation), Westside Electric Wholesale, Inc. (a California corporation) and Westside Wholesale Electric & Lighting, Inc. (a California corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/13/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
January 23, 2013 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal of Claims Against Garvin Industries, Inc., With Prejudice and Without Costs re 116 Notice (Other), filed by Leviton Manufacturing Co., Inc. Garvin Industries, Inc. (an Illinois corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/23/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
December 7, 2012 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Dismissal of Claims Against American Ace Supply Inc., With Prejudice and Without Costs re 113 Notice (Other) filed by Leviton Manufacturing Co., Inc. American Ace Supply Inc. (a California corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/7/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
July 2, 2012 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING STAY. the action is stayed until all appeals of the ITCdetermination have been exhausted, and the Clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this matter. This order does not preclude any party from moving to reopen this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, every six months, the parties shall submit joint status statements to inform the court of any developments that may warrant removing the stay. The first status statement shall be filed no later than January 3, 2013. Additionally, upon c ompletion of the appeals, the parties shall file a notice requesting the matter be reopened and that a case management conference be scheduled. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the case management conference scheduled for July 6, 2012 is VACATED. Motions t erminated AS MOOT: 109 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at July 5, 2012 Case Management Conference filed by Leviton Manufacturing Co., Inc., 108 MOTION to Appear by Telephone in continued Case Management Conference filed by Fujian Hongan Electric Co., Ltd, Safety Plus, Royal Pacific Ltd., The Designers Edge, Inc., Garvin Industries, Inc., Zhejiang Trimone Co., Ltd., Menard, Inc., Safety Plus Products, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/2/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
October 6, 2011 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL OF ZHEJIANG EASTING HOUSE ELECTRIC CO., COST LESS LIGHTING, INC., C & S SALES LLC, D/B/A KK LITE.COM, AND LITTMAN BROTHERS ENERGY SUPPLIES, INC., WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 97 Notice (Other). Littman Bros. Energy Supplies, Inc., Zhejiang Easting House Electric Co., C& S Sales LLC and Cost Less Lighting, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/6/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
July 1, 2011 86 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting 85 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney George C. Best terminated. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 7/1/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leviton Manufacturing Co., Inc. v. Fujian Hongan Electric Co., Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Littman Bros. Energy Supplies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety Plus
Represented By: Lei Mei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Pacific Ltd.
Represented By: Lei Mei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interline Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardware and Tools Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cost Less Lighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fujian Hongan Electric Co., Ltd
Represented By: Lei Mei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Protecht Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanghai Ele Manufacturing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhejiang Trimone Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Lei Mei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhejiang Easting House Electric Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard, Inc.
Represented By: Lei Mei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garvin Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Lei Mei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Purchasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murray Lighting Co.,Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrical Marketplace, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C& S Sales LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Designers Edge, Inc.
Represented By: Lei Mei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orbit Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.E. Aubuchon Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westside Wholesale Electric & Lighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westside Electric Wholesale, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westside Wholesale, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Aspen Devices Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Deal Electric Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Ace Supply Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S.A. Isocanal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Electric Depot Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contractor Lighting & Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leviton Manufacturing Co., Inc.
Represented By: Lisa S. Mankofsky
Represented By: Gina Ann Bibby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?