Fujitsu Limited v. Belkin International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Fujitsu Limited
Defendant: Belkin International, Inc., Belkin, Inc., D-Link Corporation, D-Link Systems, Inc., Netgear, Inc., ZyXEL Communications Corporation and Zyxel Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv03972
Filed: September 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ORDER Suggesting Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/13/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 621 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 620 Stipulation Re Schedule for Post-Verdict Proceedings.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 619 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 618 Stipulation Re Schedule for Post-Verdict Proceedings.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER Granting 563 STIPULATION Re: Schedule for Post-Verdict Proceedings -- Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Schedule for Post-Verdict Proceedings filed by Fujitsu Limited. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/19/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 591 ORDER granting 540 Unopposed Request for Substitution of ECF 461 , (Exh. 4 to 12/2/2012 Hao Declaration; Dkt #461 filed by D-Link Corporation. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/18/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 587 Jurors' Note No. 3. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/17/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 579 Jurors' Note No. 1. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/14/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 570 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 451 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 548 FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS - ANNOTATED. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/12/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 524 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 521 D-Link Corporation's and D-Link System's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Re: Alter Ego Liability and Patent Exhaustion.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER Re: Objections to Exhibits and Demonstratives For December 11, 2012. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/10/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
December 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER Re Defendants' Objections to Exhibits and Demonstratives for Drs. Leonard and Mangum. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/09/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2012)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 449 Motion to Strike (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER Re Objections to Defendants Belkin and Netgear's Direct Examination Exhibits for Kurland and Chao. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/06/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER Re Witnesses for December 7, 2012. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/5/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER Re: Final Jury Instructions and Verdict Form. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/04/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER denying 469 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fujitsu Limited, and 462 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Financial Documents of D-Link Corp. in Support of Objections to Plaintiff's Trial Exhibits (459), and Supporting Declaration of Victoria Hao (461), filed by D-Link Corporation. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/03/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
December 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER Re: Disputed Evidentiary Issues for December 3, 2012 Witnesses. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/2/2012. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2012)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER Re Objections to Exhibits and Deposition Testimony for November 27, 2012. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/26/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
November 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 430 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/25/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2012)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER RE PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/21/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER RE TENTATIVE PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/20/2012. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 370 CORRECTED ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART AND DENYING-IN-PART MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/16/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 369
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 370 *** ORDER Granting-in-Part and Denying-in-Part Motions to Exclude Expert Testimony. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/15/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012) Modified on 11/16/2012 (lhklc3, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 357 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 350 Stipulation as to Fujitsu Limited's Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Arthur Brody.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 348 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 342 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER Requesting Joint Settlement Status Report. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/15/2012. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 304 Fujitsu's Motion for Leave to File Motion to Strike Defendants' New Arguments; granting in part and denying in part 255 Fujitsu's Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement; denying 259 De fendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity; denying 261 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement and No Active Inducement; denying 280 Fujitsu's Motion for Leave to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part 297 Fujitsu's Motion for Leave to File Motion to Strike or to Supplement the Record (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 302 Tentative Rulings on Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/20/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 301 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 300 Motion for Admission of Attorney Brianne Bharkhda Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER re 296 Proposed Order, filed by Fujitsu Limited. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/17/12. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER re 294 Proposed Order filed by Netgear, Inc. allowing equipment into Courtroom. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/11/12. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2012)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference and Hearings on Motions for Summary Judgment. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/4/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 243 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 242 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Submitting Joint Case Management Statement.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 232 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 231 . Amended Order Construing Claim Terms. This Order is identical to Docket # 231 , but at page 11, line 6, adds a line of text that was erroneously omitted from the original order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/3/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 226 Stipulation Re: Invalidity Contentions.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER re 210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, and Denying 216 Joint Request to Take Fujitsu's Motion for Leave to Serve Supplemental Infringement Contentions Off Calendar. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/30/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER re 220 STIPULATION Postponing Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 2/15/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/26/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2012)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 208 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Laura Katherine Carter terminated (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER re 204 Stipulation Continuing Case Management Conference to 2/1/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/16/11. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER re 202 Stipulation Extending Deadline for Filing a Joint Case Management Statement to 12/19/11. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/9/11. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 197 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER re 183 ORDER Permitting Fujitsu Limited's Legal-Graphics Provider to Bring Equipment into the Courthouse for Claim Construction Tutorial and Hearing filed by Fujitsu Limited. Signed by Judge Koh on 10/5/11. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER Denying 135 and 136 Motions to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process. The September 8, 2011 motion hearing is vacated. The September 8, 2011 case management conference remains as set. As noted herein, the parties shall file a supplemental case management statement by 8:00 p.m., September 8, 2011. Signed by Judge Koh on 9/6/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting 165 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF FUJITSU LIMITED AND DEFENDANT NETGEAR, INC.'S JULY 28, 2011 JOINT SUBMISSION REGARDING UNRESOLVED ESI ISSUES re 159 Statement filed by Fujitsu Limited. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 1, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting 137 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Joshua Wyde.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER re 130 Notice of Withdrawal of Attorneys. Signed by Judge Koh on 6/2/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 123 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and Dismiss. Signed by Judge Koh on 6/1/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 18, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER by Judge Koh granting 116 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Judge Koh granting 110 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Judge Koh granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion to Dismiss; denying 53 Motion to Dismiss; denying 54 Motion to Dismiss. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Koh granting 82 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Koh granting 71 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Koh granting 65 request to reset the Case Management Conference date, scheduled hearing, and briefing dates (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re 34 Granting Motion to Disqualify Counsel and Denying Motion for Stay. Signed by Judge Koh on 12/22/2010.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT, HEARING AND BRIEFING DATES Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing (re Docket # 46, 48) set for 2/10/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/29/10. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re 30 GRANTING APPLICATION OF VICTORIA HAO FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Koh on 10/1/2010. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fujitsu Limited v. Belkin International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fujitsu Limited
Represented By: Kevin E Cadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belkin International, Inc.
Represented By: David P. Enzminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belkin, Inc.
Represented By: David P. Enzminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D-Link Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D-Link Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Duncan Matthew Palmatier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netgear, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Bovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZyXEL Communications Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zyxel Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Duncan Matthew Palmatier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?