Joffe v. Google, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Benjamin Joffe
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv04007
Filed: September 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2010 Pursuant to Signed Related Case Order ( 4 ). Case reassigned to Judge James Ware for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all discovery matters. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 20, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated re 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER. On or before 11/8/2010, Plaintiffs shall file a Master Consolidated Complaint that includes all claims against Defendant Google, both Federal and State. The Court will set an interim Case Management Conference once the Master Consolidated Complaint is filed. C 10-04007 HRL Joffe v. Google, Inc. and C 10-04084 PVT Marigza et al v. Google, Inc. shall be added as a member cases to C 10-02184 JW In re Google Street View. C 10-02187 JW Berlage et al v. Google, Inc. has previously been added as a member case to C 10-02184 JW In re Google Street View. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 9, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/16/2010. Case Management Conference set for 11/23/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Judge Howard R. Lloyd Standing Order re Initial Case Management and Discovery Disputes, # 2 Standing Order Regarding Case Management in Civil Cases for all San Jose Judges, # 3 Standing Orders for All Judges of the Northern District of California)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 1 Class Action COMPLAINT street view (Summons Issued); jury demand; against Google, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611050396) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010) Modified on 9/14/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joffe v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Joffe
Represented By: Vincent J. Esades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?