Marigza et al v. Google, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Lilla Marigza, Wesley Hartline, David Binkley and Blake Carter
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv04084
Filed: September 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2010 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Binkley, Lilla Marigza, Wesley Hartline, Blake Carter. Google, Inc. served on 9/15/2010, answer due 10/6/2010. (Barnett, Kathryn) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kathryn E. Barnett. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/21/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kenneth Byrd. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/21/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brian P. Manookian. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/21/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 21, 2010 Pursuant to Signed Related Case Order ( 11 ). Case reassigned to Judge James Ware for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all discovery matters. Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull no longer assigned to the case. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 20, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated re 4 ADR Scheduling Order. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RELATED CASE ORDER. On or before 11/8/2010, Plaintiffs shall file a Master Consolidated Complaint that includes all claims against Defendant Google, both Federal and State. The Court will set an interim Case Management Conference once the Master Consolidated Complaint is filed. C 10-04007 HRL Joffe v. Google, Inc. and C 10-04084 PVT Marigza et al v. Google, Inc. shall be added as a member cases to C 10-02184 JW In re Google Street View. C 10-02187 JW Berlage et al v. Google, Inc. has previously been added as a member case to C 10-02184 JW In re Google Street View. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 17, 2010 Filing 10 (Proposed) Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Brian P. Manookian to appear in Pro Hac Vice re 9 by Lilla Marigza. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 17, 2010 Filing 9 Application for Admission of Attorney Brian P. Manookian to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611008146) filed by Lilla Marigza. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 17, 2010 Filing 8 (Proposed) Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Kenneth Byrd to appear in Pro Hac Vice re 7 by Lilla Marigza. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 17, 2010 Filing 7 Application for Admission of Attorney Kenneth Byrd to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611008145) filed by Lilla Marigza. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 17, 2010 Filing 6 (Proposed) Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Kathryn E. Barnett to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Lilla Marigza. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 17, 2010 Filing 5 Application for Admission of Attorney Kathryn E. Barnett to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611008144) filed by Lilla Marigza. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/16/2010. Case Management Conference set for 11/23/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose.. Signed by Judge Trumbull on 9/10/10. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 10, 2010 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc.. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 10, 2010 Filing 2 MOTION to Relate cases C10-4084 PVT, and C10-2187 JW, similar cases have already been transferred by the JPML No. MDL 2184 JW filed by David Binkley, Blake Carter, Wesley Hartline, Lilla Marigza. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010) Modified text on 9/14/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 10, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Google, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611008088.). Filed byDavid Binkley, Lilla Marigza, Wesley Hartline, Blake Carter. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marigza et al v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilla Marigza
Represented By: Kathryn E. Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Hartline
Represented By: Kathryn E. Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Binkley
Represented By: Kathryn E. Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Carter
Represented By: Kathryn E. Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?