Directv, Inc. v. Pham et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Directv, Inc.
Defendant: Anh Thu Xuan Pham and Anh Thu Restautant, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv04142
Filed: September 15, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. 16 MOTION to Dismiss Anh Thu Xuan Pham, et al filed by Directv, Inc.. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2010)
December 28, 2010 16 MOTION for Dismissal filed by Directv, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order)(Lonstein, Julie) (Filed on 12/28/2010) Modified on 12/29/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2010 15 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 12/06/2010. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
November 18, 2010 14 CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/23/10 2:00 PM Initial Case Management Conference CONTINUED to 1/18/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
November 8, 2010 13 Consent MOTION for Continuance November 23, 2010, Initial Case Management Conference and corresponding deadlines and (Proposed) Order filed by Directv, Inc. (Lonstein, Julie) (Filed on 11/8/2010) Modified on 11/9/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/9/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2010 12 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
October 27, 2010 11 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER re 10 Stipulation filed by Directv, Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on October 27, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
October 25, 2010 10 STIPULATION for extension of time to answer complaint re ( 1 ) by Directv, Inc. (Rawlings-Hoyer, Kari) (Filed on 10/25/2010) Linkage added on 10/26/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2010 9 Proof of Service as to defendant Anh Thu Xuan Pham individually served on 10/4/2010 by Directv, Inc. (Rawlings-Hoyer, Kari) (Filed on 10/25/2010) Modified on 10/26/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2010 8 Proof of Service as to defendant Anh Thu Restautant, Inc. doing business as Anh Thu Restaurant served on 10/4/2010 by Directv, Inc. (Rawlings-Hoyer, Kari) (Filed on 10/25/2010) Modified on 10/26/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 7 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/16/2010. Case Management Conference set for 11/23/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Judge Trumbull Standing Order for Civil Practice in Assigned Cases for all Purposes, # 2 Standing Order Regarding Case Management in Civil Cases for all San Jose Judges, # 3 Standing Orders for All Judges of the Northern District of California)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 6 Summons Issued as to Anh Thu Restautant, Inc.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 5 Summons Issued as to Anh Thu Xuan Pham. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 4 (Proposed) Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Julie Cohen Lonstein to appear in Pro Hac Vice re 3 by Directv, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 3 Application for Admission of Attorney Julie Cohen Lonstein to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611008107) filed by Directv, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Directv, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 1 COMPLAINT (Summons Issue) against Anh Thu Restautant, Inc., Anh Thu Xuan Pham ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611008107). Filed byDirectv, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Directv, Inc. v. Pham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Directv, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anh Thu Xuan Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anh Thu Restautant, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?