Su v. Defense Language Institute Foreign Language Center & POM
Plaintiff: Dantao Su
Defendant: Defense Language Institute Foreign Language Center & POM
Case Number: 5:2010cv04194
Filed: September 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Plaintiff has not complied as directed. Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/16/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DENYING 34 PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/19/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING 19 Request for Action filed by Dantao Su. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/6/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF PROCESS. The Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis has been GRANTED and that the Clerk issue summons. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the U.S. Marshal for the Northern District of California serve, without prepayment of fees, a copy of the complaint, any amendments, scheduling orders, attachments, plaintiff's affidavit and this Order upon the Defendant. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/29/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. ***4/11/2011 CMC Deadlines terminated re 3 ADR Scheduling Order. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/10/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/6/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Su v. Defense Language Institute Foreign Language Center & POM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dantao Su
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defense Language Institute Foreign Language Center & POM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?