Microchip Technology, Inc., et al v. United Module Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Microchip Technology, Inc., and Silicon Storage Technology, Inc.
Defendant: United Module Corp. and Keranos, LLC
Case Number: 5:2010cv04241
Filed: September 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Granting Defendants' Motions to Transfer in Related Cases: 5:10-cv-04241-LHK; 5:10-cv-05290-LHK; 5:10-cv-05196-LHK; and 5:11-cv-00430-LHK. The Clerk shall close the files in these Related Cases. Signed by Judge Koh on 6/9/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION and ORDER STAYING CASE until June 8, 2011. The parties shall complete mediation on or before June 7, 2011. Signed by Judge Koh on 5/3/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 AMENDED ORDER Staying Related Cases Until June 6, 2011, and Referring Parties to Mediation through the Court's ADR Program. Signed by Judge Koh on 3/11/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Staying Related Cases until June 6, 2011 and Referring Parties to Mediation through the Court's ADR Program. The Clerk shall administratively close the files. Signed by Judge Koh on 3/10/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Seeking Clarification re 64 Joint Stipulation for Stay and Alternative Dispute Resolution. Parties' Response Required by Thursday, March 10, 2011. Signed by Judge Koh on 3/7/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re 60 Granting Application of Truman Fenton for Admission Pro Hac Vice in case 5:10-cv-04241-LHK; 5:10-cv-05196-LHK; 5:10-cv-05290-LHK; and 5:11-cv-00430-LHK. Signed by Judge Koh on 3/3/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER APPROVING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE re (52 in 5:10-cv-04241-LHK) Proposed Order, filed by Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/2/11. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting 51 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Limited Portion of Reply. Signed by Judge Koh on 2/28/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 39 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Koh on 2/18/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 19 Application of Paul A. Gennari for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Koh on 2/17/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule in Related Cases: 10-cv-04241, 10-cv-05196, 10-cv-05290. Signed by Judge Koh on 1/13/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 28 Motion to Relate Case. Cases 10-CV-05196 and 10-CV-05290 are related to this case. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re 19 Granting Application of Bruce W. Slayden II for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Koh on 11/19/2010. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/14/10. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Microchip Technology, Inc., et al v. United Module Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microchip Technology, Inc.,
Represented By: Paul J. Andre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silicon Storage Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Andre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Module Corp.
Represented By: Monica Mucchetti Eno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keranos, LLC
Represented By: Monica Mucchetti Eno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?