Google, Inc. et al v. Jackman et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Google, Inc.
Defendant: Omar Jackman, John Doe Simon and John Does
Case Number: 5:2010cv04264
Filed: September 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2010 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google, Inc. re 29 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, (Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 26 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 3/9/2011. Case Management Conference set for 3/16/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose.Signed by Judge Koh on 12/17/2010. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 14, 2010 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google, Inc. re 26 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference, 27 Proposed Order (Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 12/14/2010)
December 13, 2010 Filing 27 Proposed Order re 26 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Google, Inc.. (Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 13, 2010 Filing 26 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
November 29, 2010 Filing 25 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options By Parties and Counsel (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 19, 2010 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google, Inc. re 20 Summons Issued (Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 19, 2010 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google, Inc. re 22 Waiver of Service Executed (Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 19, 2010 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Google, Inc.. Service waived by Omar Jackman waiver sent on 11/4/2010, answer due 1/3/2011. (Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
October 26, 2010 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Standing Orders, Order Setting Initial CMC and ADR Deadlines, ECF Registration, Notice of Assignment of Case to US Magistrate Judge for Trial served on Omar Jackman on September 29, 2010, filed by Google, Inc.. (Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 21, 2010 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Gina Wyant. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 21, 2010 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Joey Patron. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 21, 2010 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Amanda Odell. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 21, 2010 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Gregory Gavin. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 19, 2010 Filing 16 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Omar Jackman, John Doe "Simon", Gregory Gavin, Amanda Odell, Joey Patron, Gina Wyant. Filed by Google, Inc.. (Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 10/19/2010) Modified text on 10/20/2010 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2010 Filing 15 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Conference statement due 12/13/10. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 10/01/2010. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
September 29, 2010 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 11 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Google, Inc (Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 9/29/2010) Modified on 9/30/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. 12 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 29, 2010 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 29, 2010 Filing 11 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Google, Inc. (Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 9/29/2010) Modified on 9/29/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Albert Gidari. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Rebecca S. Engrav. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 27, 2010 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Omar Jackman. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 24, 2010 Filing 7 (Proposed) Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Albert Gidari to to appear in Pro Hac Vice re 6 by Google, Inc (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2010) Modified on 9/28/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2010 Filing 6 Application for Admission of Attorney Albert Gidari to to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611008195) filed by Google, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 24, 2010 Filing 5 (Proposedf) Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Rebecca S.Engrav to to appear in Pro Hac Vice re 4 by Google, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 24, 2010 Filing 4 Application for Admission of Attorney Rebecca S. Engrav to to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611008196 ) filed by Google, Inc (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 21, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 21, 2010 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2010. Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Judge Howard R. Lloyd Standing Order re Initial Case Management and Discovery Disputes, # 2 Standing Orders for All Judges of the Northern District of California, # 3 Standing Orders for All Judges of the Northern District of California)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 21, 2010 Filing 2 Statement Disclosure Statement by Google, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 21, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS); jury demand; against John Does, Omar Jackman, John Doe Simon ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611050838). Filed by Google, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Google, Inc. et al v. Jackman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Bobbie Jean Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Jackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?