Khan v. World Savings Bank, FSB
Plaintiff: Seema Khan
Defendant: World Savings Bank, FSB
Case Number: 5:2010cv04305
Filed: September 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Koh granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of mailing) (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/17/2011 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 2/17/2011. Signed by Judge Koh on 1/21/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of mailing)(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING 10 Amended MOTION to Dismiss with leave to amend in part; DENYING AS MOOT 11 Amended MOTION to Strike. Signed by Judge Koh on 1/14/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan v. World Savings Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seema Khan
Represented By: Wendell Jamon Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Savings Bank, FSB
Represented By: Jeremy E Shulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?