R. v. Morgan Hill Unified School District et al
Plaintiff: Cayla R.
Defendant: Morgan Hill Unified School District, Thomas Fried, Christopher Rizzuto and Jay Totter
Case Number: 5:2010cv04312
Filed: September 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 29:0794
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Stipulated Dismiss or Joint Status Statement due by 7/2/2012. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/13/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/21/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Edward J. Davila granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion to Dismiss (ejdlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE MEDIATION re 58 Stipulation. Mediation deadline 1/29/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/7/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE MEDIATION re 56 Stipulation. Mediation Deadline 12/15/2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/07/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Extend Deadline to Complete Mediation re 45 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/5/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Extend Deadline to Complete Mediation re 45 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/5/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. In light of the pending dispositive Motion, the Court finds that a Case Management Conference would be premature at this time. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the March 14 Conference. The Court will set a new Case Management Conference date in its Order addressing Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, if necessary. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/9/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Stipulation for Enlargement of Time re 33 Stipulation. The hearing remains on calendar as previously set for 3/14/20111 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/7/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Deadline to Complete Mediation re 27 Stipulation. Mediation deadline 5/20/2011. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/28/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 3 REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Deadline for ADR Session: 90 days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/19/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R. v. Morgan Hill Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cayla R.
Represented By: Christian Marie Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Hill Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Fried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Rizzuto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Totter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?