Peter B. Inc et al v. Comerica Bank et al
Plaintiff: |
Peter B. Inc and Foxglove, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Comerica Bank and United Security Bank |
Case Number: |
5:2010cv04454 |
Filed: |
October 1, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Jose Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Howard R. Lloyd |
Nature of Suit: |
Truth in Lending |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 16, 2011 |
Filing
49
STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING Dismissal of Action With Prejudice pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure re 48 Stipulation. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/16/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
|
September 12, 2011 |
Filing
40
Order Granting 38 Motion to Appear by Telephone as to Defendant United Security Bank for 9/16/2011 Case Management Conference. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 9/12/2011.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
|
February 22, 2011 |
Filing
21
ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. In light of the pending dispositive Motion, the Court finds that a Preliminary Pretrial Conference would be premature at this time. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the February 28 Conference.1 The Court will set a new Case Management Conference date in its Order addressing Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, if necessary. In light of the Court's vacating the February 28 Conference, Plaintiff's counsel's Motion to Appear Telephonically is DENIED as moot. Motions terminated: 20 MOTION to Appear by Telephone by Kevin Mirch filed by Foxglove, Inc., Peter B. Inc. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/22/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
|
December 29, 2010 |
Filing
9
STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR Extension of Time Within Which Defendant Comerica Bank May Respond To The Complaint re 8 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/29/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
|
December 8, 2010 |
Filing
7
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Plaintiffs shall serve this Order on Defendants along with the Summons and Complaint and file the appropriate certificate of service on or before 1/29/2011. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/18/2011. Case Management Conference set for 2/28/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/8/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?