Securities And Exchange Commission v. Alexander et al
Plaintiff: Securities And Exchange Commission
Defendant: Barbra Alexander, Beth Pina, Michael E Swanson and APS Funding, Inc
Case Number: 5:2010cv04535
Filed: October 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ALEXANDER FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 17, 2015. **The Clerk shall close the case file.** (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015) Modified on 7/17/2015 (sms, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 80 Stipulation (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on November 5, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 PROPOSED CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on October 31, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER VACATING NOVEMBER 6, 2014 HEARING ON MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR NOVEMBER 6, 2014. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on September 25, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO JUDGE LUCY H. KOH FOR CONSIDERATION OF RELATED CASE STATUS. The above-entitled action is referred to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh for a determination as to whether this case is related to Case No. 5:10-cr-00730 LHK, a criminal action currently pending before Judge Koh. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/26/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting Substitution of Attorney re 40 Affidavit filed by Michael E Swanson. Attorney Danna Paje terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/18/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE TO FILE STIPULATION STAYING CASE re 37 Status Report. The Court sets a deadline of August 31, 2011 to file a Stipulation and Proposed Order staying the case pending the proceedings of the related criminal action, 5:10-cr-00730-JF-1 USA v. Alexander et al. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/16/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING EXEMPTIONS FROM STAY re 29 . Signed by Judge Koh on 2/4/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of mailing)(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING 16 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Answer. Signed by Judge Koh on 12/22/2010. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RELATING CASES, HOWEVER, REASSIGNMENT TO ME OF THE ACTION CURRENTLY ASSIGNED TO ANOTHER JUDGE IS NOT WARRANTED. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/18/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities And Exchange Commission v. Alexander et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities And Exchange Commission
Represented By: Eric Matthew Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbra Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Pina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael E Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APS Funding, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?