Higginbotton v. U.S. Bankcorp et al
Plaintiff: Harold Higginbotton
Defendant: U.S. Bankcorp, U.S. Bank, N.A. and Lyon Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv04593
Filed: October 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal of Case with Prejudice re 40 Stipulation. The Clerk shall close this file. *** All Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/17/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Stay Case-Related Deadlines re 38 Stipulation. Deadline to file Amended Complaint due 6/15/2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/2/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re 36 Stipulation. Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/24/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Koh granting 18 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend; granting 29 Motion for Leave to File. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Higginbotton v. U.S. Bankcorp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Higginbotton
Represented By: Justin Theodore Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bankcorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyon Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?