Graf v. Zynga Game Network, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Nancy Walther Graf
Defendant: Zynga Game Network, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv04680
Filed: October 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2010 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 11/23/2010) Modified on 11/24/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2010 Filing 22 Response to this 18 Court's November 15, 2010 Order Re: Consolidation Zynga Actions C10-4680 JW, C10-4723 JW, C10-4793 JW, C10-4794 JW, C10-4902 JW, C10-4930 JW, C10-4935 JW, and C10-5192 JW and Appointment of Co-Lead Plaintiff and Co-Lead Counsel filed by Karen Bryant, William J. O'Hara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Dec of Eric H. Gibbs, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Dec of Jeff S. Westerman, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Joint Dec of Plaintiffs)(Related document(s) 18 ) (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 11/22/2010) Modified on 11/24/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/30/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2010 Filing 21 MOTION to Consolidate Zynga Actions C10-4680 JW, C10-4723 JW, C10-4793 JW, C10-4794 JW, C10-4902 JW, C10-4930 JW, C10-4935 JW, and C10-5192 JW Cases in the In re: Facebook Privacy Litigation, C10-2389 JW Cases for All Purposes and to Address Related Issues in Response to Court's 18 November 12, 2010 and November 19, 2010 filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 11/22/2010) Modified text on 11/23/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/30/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2010 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Request for 18 Briefing Re Case Consolidation Zynga Actions C10-4680 JW, C10-4723 JW, C10-4793 JW, C10-4794 JW, C10-4902 JW, C10-4930 JW, C10-4935 JW, and C10-5192 JW by Zynga Game Network, Inc.. (Seabolt, Richard) (Filed on 11/22/2010) Modified on 11/24/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/30/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2010 Filing 19 Response to Court 18 Order Dated November 12, 2010 Requesting Court Separately Consolidate Zynga Actions C10-4680 JW, C10-4723 JW, C10-4793 JW, C10-4794 JW, C10-4902 JW, C10-4930 JW, C10-4935 JW, and C10-5192 JW Related Cases as In re: Zynga Privacy Litigation, Designate Lead Plaintiffs and Appoint Co-Lead Counsel filed by Valerie Gudac, Richard Beiles. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Adam J. Levitt In Support thereof , # 2 Declaration of Service)(Gregorek, Francis) (Filed on 11/22/2010) Modified on 11/30/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2010 Pursuant to Signed Related Case Order ( 18 ). Case reassigned to Judge James Ware for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull for all discovery matters. Judge William H. Alsup no longer assigned to the case. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 15, 2010 Filing 18 GRANTING MOTION TO RELATE CASES. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court shall immediately relate Graf v. Zynga, Case No. CV 10- 04680-WHA, Albini v. Zynga; Facebook, Inc., Case No. CV 10-04723-JL, Gudac v. Zynga, Case No. CV 10-04793-EMC, Schreiber v. Zynga, Case No. CV 10-04794-JCS, Swanson v. Zynga, Case No. 10-04902-HRL, Carmel-Jessup v. Facebook; Zynga, Case No. 10-04930-MEJ and Phee v. Facebook; Zynga, Case No. CV 10-04935-SC, to In Re: Facebook Privacy Litigation, Case No. CV 10-02389-JW. Defendant Zynga, in its Motion to Relate, raises the issue of whether these related actions should be consolidated into a single action. The Court invites the parties to fully brief the issue. On or before 11/22/2010, the parties shall file briefs as to whether these related actions should be consolidated into the current action, In Re: Facebook Privacy Litigation or consolidated as a separate action, In Re: Zynga Litigation. In their briefs, the parties shall nominate Lead Plaintiffs as well as Lead Counsel. The Court will take the parties briefs under submission without oral argument. Motions terminated: (10 in 3:10-cv-04794-RS) First MOTION to Relate Case filed by Howard L. Schreiber, (41 in 5:10-cv-02389-JW) MOTION to Relate Case filed by Zynga Game Network Inc. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 16 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
November 10, 2010 Filing 16 CLERKS NOTICE Scheduling Initial CMC on Reassignment. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2010 11:00 AM. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
November 8, 2010 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Zynga Game Network, Inc.. (Seabolt, Richard) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 5, 2010 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zynga Game Network, Inc. / Proof of Service of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related, Filed In Re: Facebook Privacy Litigation Before Judge Ware; Administrative Motion; Seabolt Declaration; and [Proposed] Order (Seabolt, Richard) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
October 29, 2010 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Zynga Game Network, Inc. (Seabolt, Richard) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 29, 2010 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nancy Walther Graf re 1 Complaint, 4 Summons Issued (Dillingham, Michael) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF RICHMAN by Judge Alsup granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ASCHENBRENER by Judge Alsup granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
October 27, 2010 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Benjamin H. Richman ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611052150), filed by Nancy Walther Graf. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
October 26, 2010 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Michael J. Aschenbrener ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611052147), filed by Nancy Walther Graf. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William H. Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge James Larson no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/22/10. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2010: # 1 Corrected Reassignment Order) (mab, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2010 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 22, 2010 AMENDED ORDER REASSIGNING CASE., Case Reassigned to Judge Hon. William H. Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge James Larson no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/22/10. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 21, 2010 Filing 5 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Nancy Walther Graf. (Nassiri, Kassra) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 18, 2010 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Zynga Game Network, Inc. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 18, 2010 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Nancy Walther Graf (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 18, 2010 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/19/2011. Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order for all Judges)(mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 18, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zynga Game Network, Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611051801.). Filed by Nancy Walther Graf. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graf v. Zynga Game Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Walther Graf
Represented By: Michael James Aschenbrener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zynga Game Network, Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Seabolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?