Nazomi Communications Inc v. Nokia Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Nazomi Communications Inc
Defendant: Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc, Amazon.com Inc, Western Digital Corporation, Western Digital Technologies Inc, Garmin Corporation, Garmin International Inc, Garmin USA Inc, Sling Media Inc and Vizio Inc
Intervenor_dft: ARM LTD. and ARM Inc
Case Number: 5:2010cv04686
Filed: October 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER 453 Granting Stipulation Regarding the TIme to Oppose Defendant's Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/19/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER by Judge Whyte as to the 7,080,362 and 7,225,436 patents granting defendants' motion for summary judgment of noninfringement and denying as moot defendants' motion for summary judgment of invalidity. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 441 Order Construing Claims of 7,080,362 and 7,225,436 patents. Signed by Judge Whyte on 6/14/2013. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER re 435 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 436 Declaration in Support, filed by ARM LTD., ARM Inc, 379 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Nazomi Communications Inc (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER 433 Granting Notice of Change of Counsel for Nazomi. Attorney James M Wodarski; Matthew David Durell and David A Loo terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/28/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 435 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte denying 379 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 428 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting 408 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER allowing parties to bring laptop and projector. Signed by Judge Whyte on 11/19/2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 401 STIPULATION AND ORDER 400 in C-10-04685-RMW; 236 in C-10-05545-RMW - Re: Stipulation Re: Scheduling Claims Construction and Motion for Summary Judgment. Claims Construction Hearing set for 11/28/2012 09:00 AM. Tutorial Hearing set for 11/19/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/11/12. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER 396 in (C-10-04686); 231 in (C-10-05545) Granting Request for Order Permitting Withdrawal as Counsel for Defendant Vizio. Attorney Laurie Michelle Charrington and David B. Cochran Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/4/12. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER CONSTRUING DISPUTED CLAIM LANGUAGE; GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on August 14, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER ON STIPULATION AND WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION granting (374) Stipulation in case 5:10-cv-04686-RMW; granting (214) Stipulation in case 5:10-cv-05545-RMW. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/13/2012. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER 385 Allowing Defendants to Use Certain Equipment in Courtroom. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/1/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER RE TECHNOLOGY TUTORIAL. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/17/2012. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE re 351 (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 378 STIPULATED SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY OF NON-PARTY ORACLE AMERICA, INC.'S MATERIAL. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/11/2012. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 355 PROTECTIVE ORDER, re-entered pursuant to 345 Stipulation.(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 340 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on April 16, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER 317 Regarding Case Schedule: Further Case Management Conference set for 3/30/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/10/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 310 STIPULATION AND ORDER 309 in case no. 5:10-cv-04685-RMW 124 in case no. 5:10-cv--5545-RMW to Extend Mediation Deadlines. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/20/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 308 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 307 to extend disclosure deadlines. Signed by Judge Whyte on 10/6/2011. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 285 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING MEDIATION DEADLINES re (283 in 5:10-cv-04686-JF), (106 in 5:10-cv-05545-JF). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/4/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER EXTENDING THE TIME FOR DEFENDANT AMAZON.COM INC. TO SERVE ITS INITIAL DISCLOSURES re 272 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/19/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER GRANTING 249 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/14/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 264 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 258 , Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/8/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/28/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 233 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re: Kevin Anderson (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/10/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 193 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge David O. Carter. (nbo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nazomi Communications Inc v. Nokia Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nazomi Communications Inc
Represented By: William D. Belanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia Corporation
Represented By: Peter Reza Afrasiabi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia Inc
Represented By: Peter Reza Afrasiabi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Digital Corporation
Represented By: George Braxton Newhouse, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Digital Technologies Inc
Represented By: George Braxton Newhouse, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garmin Corporation
Represented By: Roger L. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garmin International Inc
Represented By: Roger L. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garmin USA Inc
Represented By: Roger L. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sling Media Inc
Represented By: Charles S. Barquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vizio Inc
Represented By: Kevin G. McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: ARM LTD.
Represented By: Kevin Paul Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: ARM Inc
Represented By: Kevin Paul Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?