Facebook, Inc. v. MaxBounty, Inc Featured Case

Facebook's lawsuit against MaxBounty, Inc. a Canadian internet advertising company, accusing it of CAN-SPAM Act violations, computer fraud, fraud, trademark dilution, breach of contract, tortious interference with contract, and false designation of origin

Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Defendant: MaxBounty, Inc
Case Number: 5:2010cv04712
Filed: October 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER re 49 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/14/11. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
November 10, 2011 Filing 49 STIPULATION for Dismissal, and Proposed Order Thereon by Facebook, Inc., MaxBounty, Inc. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 11/10/2011)
October 19, 2011 Filing 48 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2011. Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Judge Jeremy Fogel no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 09/27/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING 39 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/14/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Thomson (Thomson, William) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 44 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/8/2011 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 7/8/2011) re 39 MOTION to Dismiss. The motion is taken under submission. (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/8/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 43 REPLY (re 39 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Motion ) filed byMaxBounty, Inc. (Lewry, Thomas) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 17, 2011 Filing 42 RESPONSE (re 39 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Motion ) Plaintiff Facebook, Inc.'s Opposition to MaxBounty, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Counts I, II, and III of Facebook's First Amended Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying MaxBounty, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Counts I, II, and III of Facebook's First Amended Complaint)(McCullagh, James) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
May 13, 2011 Filing 41 Answer to Amended Complaint 36 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand byMaxBounty, Inc. (Lewry, Thomas) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 13, 2011 Filing 40 Brief re 39 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Motion filed byMaxBounty, Inc. (Related document(s) 39 ) (Lewry, Thomas) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 13, 2011 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Motion filed by MaxBounty, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lewry, Thomas) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
May 5, 2011 Filing 37 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint filed by MaxBounty, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(LeRoy, John) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
April 19, 2011 Filing 36 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MaxBounty, Inc. Filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D to Amended Complaint)(McCullagh, James) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 11 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/28/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
February 11, 2011 Filing 34 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/11/2011 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 2/11/2011) re 11 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I-III of the Complaint. The motion is taken under submission. (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/11/2011)
January 28, 2011 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re 11 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I-III of the Complaint filed byMaxBounty, Inc. (LeRoy, John) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 21, 2011 Filing 32 Declaration of James R. McCullagh in Support of 31 Memorandum in Opposition to MaxBounty, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Counts I, II and III of the Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 31 ) (McCullagh, James) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 21, 2011 Filing 31 Memorandum in Opposition re 11 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I-III of the Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McCullagh, James) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE RULE 16(b)SCHEDULING CONFERENCE re 28 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/6/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
December 23, 2010 Filing 29 Declaration of John S. LeRoy in Support of 28 Stipulation filed byMaxBounty, Inc. (Related document(s) 28 ) (LeRoy, John) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 23, 2010 Filing 28 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Continue Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference by MaxBounty, Inc. (LeRoy, John) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Joseph P. Cutler (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for James R. McCullagh (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 13, 2010 Filing 25 Proposed Order re 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 54611008695.) by Facebook, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 13, 2010 Filing 24 MOTION for Attorney Joseph P. Cutler for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 54611008695.) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 13, 2010 Filing 23 Proposed Order re 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 54611008694.) by Facebook, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 13, 2010 Filing 22 MOTION for Attorney James McCullagh for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 54611008694.) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 13, 2010 Filing 21 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian Patrick Hennessy Notice of Change of Firm Address (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 9, 2010 Filing 20 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Thomas A. Lewry. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to John S. LeRoy. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
December 6, 2010 Filing 17 Proposed Order re 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 54611008653.) by MaxBounty, Inc. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
December 6, 2010 Filing 16 MOTION for Attoreny Thomas A. Lewry for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 54611008653.) filed by MaxBounty, Inc. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
December 6, 2010 Filing 15 Proposed Order re 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 54611008653.) by MaxBounty, Inc. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
December 6, 2010 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorneyt John S. LeRouy for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 54611008653.) filed by MaxBounty, Inc. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
December 2, 2010 Filing 13 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff Facebook, Inc. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
November 30, 2010 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMaxBounty, Inc. (Mizrahi, Mark) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 30, 2010 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I-III of the Complaint filed by MaxBounty, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement, # 2 Proposed Order)(Mizrahi, Mark) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeremy Fogel for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 11/30/2010. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 29, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. 9 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 29, 2010 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 24, 2010 Filing 8 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Facebook, Inc. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 11/24/2010) Modified on 11/29/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2010 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Maxbounty to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint re ( 1 ) by MaxBounty, Inc. (Mizrahi, Mark) (Filed on 11/24/2010) Modified on 11/29/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2010 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Facebook, Inc.. MaxBounty, Inc served on 10/20/2010, answer due 11/10/2010. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
October 19, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 19, 2010 Filing 5 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/21/2010. Case Management Conference set for 12/28/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Judge Howard R. Lloyd Standing Order re Initial Case Management and Discovery Disputes, # 2 Standing Order for San Jose Division Judges, # 3 Standing Orders for All Judges of the Northern District of California)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 19, 2010 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to MaxBounty, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 19, 2010 Filing 3 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-16 by Facebook, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 19, 2010 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Facebook, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 19, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Summons Issued): jury demand; against MaxBounty, Inc ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611008342). Filed by Facebook, Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B to Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C to Complaint, # 4 Exhibit D to Complaint, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010) Modified on 10/20/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Facebook, Inc. v. MaxBounty, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Perry Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MaxBounty, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?