Vann v. Aurora Loan Services LLC
Plaintiff: Eulalia C Vann
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services LLC
Case Number: 5:2010cv04736
Filed: October 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting request to appear telephonically re 20 Notice (Other) filed by Aurora Loan Services LLC. Counsel directed to contact CourtCall.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/17/11. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR PENDING MOTIONS. Hearing on 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment is set for 4/21/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Signed by Judge Koh on 2/10/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of mailing)(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER That Case Be Reassigned to a District Court Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/20/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vann v. Aurora Loan Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eulalia C Vann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?