McHale v. Silicon Valley Law Group
Plaintiff: Gerard A McHale, Jr
Defendant: Silicon Valley Law Group
Case Number: 5:2010cv04864
Filed: October 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER GRANTING re 278 Letter filed by Silicon Valley Law Group for a 15-day extension of time to submit a proposed schedule for post-trial motions. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/18/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER GRANTING re 276 Letter filed by Silicon Valley Law Group for Extension of time to 11/15/13 for filing a schedule for post-trial briefs. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/1/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER GRANTING re 274 Letter filed by Silicon Valley Law Group to extend time to 10/30/13 for filing schedule for the post-trial motions. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/9/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER GRANTING re 272 Letter filed by Silicon Valley Law Group for extension of time to 10/8/13 to file proposed schedule for post-trial briefing. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/27/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Final Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on September 16, 2013. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Final Verdict Form. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on September 13, 2013. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Court's Proposed Verdict Form. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on September 12, 2013. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER TO PAY ADDITIONAL ATTENDANCE FEE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/11/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER TO FURNISH DAILY REFRESHMENTS for the ten membersof the jury beginning on 8/27/13 at 7:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/14/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER on Motion in Limine re Damages (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER setting hearing re measure of damages. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 31, 2013. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER GRANTING re 166 Letter for Extension of Time for submission of revised binders of deposition designations filed by Silicon Valley Law Group. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/28/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER GRANTING re 160 Letter filed by Gerard A McHale, Jr for Extension of Time to File Trial Briefs.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/22/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER GRANTING re 153 JOINT Letter filed by Gerard A McHale, Jr regarding schedule for certain matters referenced in the 3/18/13 letter.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/21/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER GRANTING re 129 Letter filed by Gerard A McHale, Jr for extension of time. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/19/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 98 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 108 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 109 Motion in Limine; denying 113 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 114 Motion in Limine (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER GRANTING re 119 Trial Stipulation No. 2 filed by Gerard A McHale, Jr. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/16/13. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER GRANTING re 99 STIPULATION To Extend Deadline to File Objections to Exhibits and Designations from 12/19/12 to 1/15/13 to Further Modify the Case Management and Pretrial Order Schedule filed by Gerard A McHale, Jr. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/30/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER GRANTING LETTER REQUEST. Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/30/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero.. Signed by Judge Joseph C.Spero on 11/27/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION AND ORDER that Dft may file a partial summary judgment on proper measure of pla's damages. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/16/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MODIFY CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER OF SEPTEMBER 5, 2012. Motions in Limine Hearing set for 1/25/2013 AT 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/26/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 64 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 60 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, / Notice of Motion for Plaintiff Trustee to File a First Amended Complaint; Trustee's Memorandum of Poin ts and Authorities in Support ofJoint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 60 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, / Notice of Motion for Plaintiff Trustee to File a First Amended Complaint; Trustee's Memorandum of Po ints and Authorities in Support ofJoint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 60 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, / Notice of Motion for Plaintiff Trustee to File a First Amended Complaint; Trustee's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ofJoint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 60 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, / Notice of Motion for Plaintiff Trustee to File a First Amended Complaint; Trustee's Memorandum o f Points and Authorities in Support ofJoint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 60 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, / Notice of Motion for Plaintiff Trustee to File a First Amended Complaint; Trustee's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ofJoint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 60 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, / Notice of Motion for Plaintiff Trustee to File a First Amended Complaint; Trustee's Memorand um of Points and Authorities in Support ofJoint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 60 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, / Notice of Motion for Plaintiff Trustee to File a First Amended Complaint; Trustee's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of filed by Gerard A McHale, Jr. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/27/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/26/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 62 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages / Motion on Consent for Administrative Relief of Plaintiff Gerard A. McHale, Jr., P.A. to Exceed the Page Limits for the Opposition and Reply Papers in Response to Defendant Silicon Valley Law Group's Moti filed by Gerard A McHale, Jr. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/25/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY REFERRAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/15/11. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McHale v. Silicon Valley Law Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard A McHale, Jr
Represented By: Allyson G Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silicon Valley Law Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?