Finisar Corporation v. Agilestar.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Finisar Corporation
Defendant: Agilestar.com, Inc. and Memorydealers.com, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv04990
Filed: November 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Settlement. ***9/2/2011 Deadlines terminated. Stipulated Dismissal or Show Cause Response due by 9/30/2011. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/7/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/1/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Settlement. Stipulated Dismissal or Show Cause Response due by 8/26/2011. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/2/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/17/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 35 (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/10/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation re 27 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/28/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OTHER DEADLINESre 20 Stipulation. Upon review, the Court DENIES the parties' Stipulation as premature. Defendants chose a firm with multiple associates, capable of taking the lead to assist the Court with this case early in the litigation. With respect to the parties scheduled appearance on February 14, 2011 the Court will evaluate whether an appearance is necessary following a review of the parties' Joint Statement, to be filed with the Court on or before February 4, 2011. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/6/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Response due by 1/12/2011 re 14 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/8/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/17/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finisar Corporation v. Agilestar.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agilestar.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memorydealers.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Finisar Corporation
Represented By: Sterling Arthur Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?