Sugarman v. Ducati North America, Inc
Plaintiff: Jonas Sugarman
Defendant: Ducati North America, Inc
Case Number: 5:2010cv05246
Filed: November 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/12/2012. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT (granting 68 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/16/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 61 APPOINTING GIRARD GIBBS AS INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL FOR THE PUTATIVE CLASS AND NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PENDING MOTION (DOCKET NOS. 56 , 57 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/1/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Protective ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 10, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 34 , Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/22/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 29 ). The Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/4/2011 is RESET for 3/3/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/10/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re 18 Continuing Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/27/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sugarman v. Ducati North America, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonas Sugarman
Represented By: Eric H. Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ducati North America, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?