International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers District 9 Pension Plan et al v. Metropolitan Netcomm, Inc.
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers District 9 Pension Plan, Northern California-Northern Nevada Sound & Communication District No. 9 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Northern California-Northern Nevada Sound & Communication District No. 9 Apprenticeship & Training Committee and John O'Rourke
Defendant: Metropolitan Netcomm, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv05464
Filed: December 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 WRIT of Execution issued in the amount of $15,486.64 against Metropolitan Netcomm, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion for Default Judgment.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 19 . ORDER Vacating Hearing. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/28/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
June 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 15 MOTION for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Koh on 6/25/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2011)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FURTHER ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Koh on 4/19/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Koh on 4/18/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/13/2011. Case Management Conference set for 4/20/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Koh on 2/28/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Koh on 2/25/11. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers District 9 Pension Plan et al v. Metropolitan Netcomm, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers District 9 Pension Plan
Represented By: Eileen Marie Bissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern California-Northern Nevada Sound & Communication District No. 9 Health & Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Eileen Marie Bissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern California-Northern Nevada Sound & Communication District No. 9 Apprenticeship & Training Committee
Represented By: Eileen Marie Bissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John O'Rourke
Represented By: Eileen Marie Bissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Netcomm, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?