Easley v. County of San Benito et al
Plaintiff: Gary D Easley
Defendant: County of San Benito, San Benito Sheriff Dept., Ramon Mendoza, Jurevich, Curtis J. Hill, Director of Police Dept. and Board of Supervisors
Case Number: 5:2010cv05520
Filed: December 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST OF DEFENDANT CURTIS J. HILL TO BE EXCUSED FROM PERSONAL ATTENDANCE AT THE EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IN THIS MATTER, granting 65 Proposed Order filed by Curtis J. Hill, County of San Benito, Jurevich, Ramon Mendoza. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 8/22/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2012: # 1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DESIGNATING SERVICE OF PROCESS ON SUBSEQUENTLY-NAMED DEFENDANTS; VACATING AND RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The court finds a Case Management Conference would be premature as this time. Accordingly, the CMC scheduled for October 14, 2011, is VACATED and rescheduled for December 9, 2011, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/11/2011. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2011: # 1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/7/2011. Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/17/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Easley v. County of San Benito et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary D Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Benito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Benito Sheriff Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jurevich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis J. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?