Finisar Corporation v. Oplink Communications Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Finisar Corporation |
Defendant: |
Optical Communication Products, Inc. and Oplink Communications Inc. |
Case Number: |
5:2010cv05617 |
Filed: |
December 10, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Jose Office |
County: |
San Francisco |
Presiding Judge: |
James Ware |
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Cause of Action: |
35 U.S.C. § 145 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 8, 2011 |
Filing
43
ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION. This matter is hereby transferred to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Any existing scheduling deadlines and hearing dates are vacated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/8/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
|
June 6, 2011 |
Filing
42
STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Deadline Disclosures re 41 Stipulation. The date for the parties to exchange Patent Local Rule 4-2 disclosures shall be extended to June 10, 2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/6/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
|
May 25, 2011 |
Filing
40
STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request for Extending Mediation Deadline re 39 Stipulation. Mediation deadline set for 10/31/2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/25/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
|
May 6, 2011 |
Filing
36
STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Deadline to File Joint Case Management Conference Statement re 35 Stipulation. Case Management Conference statement due 5/6/2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/6/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
|
March 9, 2011 |
Filing
30
PATENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Based on the parties' joint submission, it appears that a schedule for the case can be set without the necessity of an appearance at this time. Accordingly, the 3/14/2011 Case Management Conference is VACATED and the par ties are ordered to comply with the following schedule: Infringement Contentions due 4/1/2011. Invalidity Contentions due 5/6/2011. Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement due 7/6/2011. Interim Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/2/201 1. Discovery due by 8/8/2011. Interim Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Tutorial Hearing set for 10/20/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 10/21/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/9/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
|
February 24, 2011 |
Filing
25
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR re 24 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/24/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
|
January 11, 2011 |
Filing
19
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT re 9 Stipulation. Response due 1/24/2011. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/11/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
|
January 4, 2011 |
Filing
15
ORDER FINDING THAT CASES ARE NOT RELATED. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 4, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?