Shih v. BMW of North America, LLC
Plaintiff: Juli Shih
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Case Number: 5:2010cv05852
Filed: December 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Barbara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Settlement. Stipulated dismissal due by 6/28/2011. If dismissal not filed by that date, then Show Cause Response due by 7/5/2011 andShow Cause Hearing set for 7/12/2011 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/2/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 20 plaintiff's request for telephonic appearance at 4/5/2011 initial case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/30/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 16 Continuing Initial Case Management Conference (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Case management conference set for 4/5/2011, 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/16/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shih v. BMW of North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juli Shih
Represented By: Brian Kelly Cline
Represented By: Brian Joseph Bickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: Shahram Nassi
Represented By: Roger Scott Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?