March 27, 2014 |
Filing
122
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 111 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/27/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
|
April 15, 2013 |
Filing
120
ORDER CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. Within 10 days of the date this order is filed, Plaintiff shall produce to Defendant all time records supporting the request for attorneys fees and costs. Within 20 days of the date time records are produced to Def endant, the parties shall conduct an in-person meet and confer session according to Civil Local Rule 54-5. The motion hearing is CONTINUED to 6/28/2013 at 9:00 a.m. On or before 6/6/2013, Plaintiff shall lodge with the court, but shall not file, a copy of all time records supporting the request for attorneys fees and costs unless a resolution is reached prior to that date. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/15/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
|
December 7, 2012 |
Filing
109
ORDER granting 92 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 100 Motion for Summary Judgment. Since this determination essentially resolves all remaining issues in this case, a judgment in favor of Lansmont which details the provisions of the injunction shall issue from the court in short order. The pretrial conference scheduled for 12/10/2012 and the ensuing trial dates are VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/7/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
|
November 15, 2012 |
Filing
102
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 89 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #2. Plaintiff's request to compel discovery is denied. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
|
August 15, 2012 |
Filing
95
ORDER RE: COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULE 79-5(d). The court extends the deadline for Plaintiff to file a declaration pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5 until 8/17/2012, at 4:00 p.m. Plaintiff is notified that failure to file a compliant declaration by the extended deadline will result in an order denying Defendants administrative motion and directing Defendant to file all documents as part of the public record, even those previously designated as confidential. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/15/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2012)
|
May 30, 2012 |
Filing
88
AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER (BENCH TRIAL). Deadline for Completion of Remaining Depositions due by 6/21/2012. Deadline for Filing Dispositive Motions due by 7/26/2012. Hearing on Anticipated Motion(s) for Summary Judgment set for 9/14/2012 09:00 AM. Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement and Motions in Limine due by 11/26/2012. Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law due by 11/30/2012. Bench Trial set for 12/12/2012, 12/13/2012 at 9:00 am - 12:00 pm, 1:30 PM - 4:30 PM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/30/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
|
May 23, 2012 |
Filing
87
PRETRIAL ORDER (BENCH TRIAL). Deadline for Completion of Remaining Depositions due by 6/21/2012. Deadline for Filing Dispositive Motions due by 7/26/2012. Hearing on Anticipated Motion(s) for Summary Judgment set for 9/14/2012 09:00 AM. Joint Final P retrial Conference Statement and Motions in Limine due by 11/26/2012. Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law due by 11/30/2012. Bench Trial set for 12/13/2012.12/14/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Bench Trial set for 12/14/2012 01:30 PM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/23/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
|
May 11, 2012 |
Filing
83
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 79 Discovery Letter Brief. Plaintiff's request for discovery granted in part and denied in part.(hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
|
March 21, 2012 |
Filing
78
ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Having reviewed the parties' joint statement, the court has determined that a pretrial conference would be premature at this time. Updated Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement due by 5/1/2012. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/21/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
|
January 3, 2012 |
Filing
69
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 68 (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/3/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
|
December 7, 2011 |
Filing
64
STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE JOINT PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE STATEMENT re 62 Stipulation. Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement 12/9/2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/7/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
|
October 18, 2011 |
Filing
60
STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Deadline to Complete Early Neutral Evaluation Program Session re 59 Stipulation. ENE deadline 10/27/2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/18/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
|
September 19, 2011 |
Filing
58
STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending the Deadline to Complete Early Neutral Evaluation Program re 57 Stipulation. Deadline for ENE due 10/17/2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/19/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
|
July 6, 2011 |
Filing
54
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR SPX CORPORATION TO ANSWER AND SERVE INITIAL DISCLOSURES re 53 Stipulation. Deadline to Answer and Serve Initial Disclosures due 7/15/2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/6/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
|
June 24, 2011 |
Filing
51
STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal as to Defendants Spectris, PLC, Bruel & Kjaer and HMB, Inc. re 50 Stipulation. Bruel & Kjaer, Spectris, PLC, Bruel & Kjaer and HMB, Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/24/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
|
June 20, 2011 |
Filing
48
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 6 , 16 Motion to Dismiss; denying 8 , 18 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay of Action. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/20/2011. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
|
March 21, 2011 |
Filing
28
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re 25 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/21/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
|