Miles v. Mack et al
Plaintiff: |
Russell D. Miles |
Defendant: |
C. Hammond, G. Williams, Bright, L. Fox, Sepulveda and Mack |
Case Number: |
5:2010cv05948 |
Filed: |
December 28, 2010 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Jose Office |
County: |
Monterey |
Presiding Judge: |
Edward J. Davila |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 3, 2013 |
Filing
48
ORDER Granting 46 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila 7/2/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
|
September 19, 2012 |
Filing
45
ORDER Granting 28 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting 32 Motion to Dismiss; Directing Defendant Williams to File Motion for Summary Judgment or Other Dispostive Motion. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Wai ver of Service of Summons, two copies of the Waiver of Service of Summons, a copy of the complaint, all attachments thereto, a copy of the Court's Order of Service (Docket No. 9), and a copy of this order upon Defendant Dr. D. Bright at the Corr ectional Training Facility in Soledad (P.O. Box 686, Soledad, CA 93960-0686). This matter shall proceed on the claims against Defendant Dr. Williams. Defendant Williams shall file a motion for summary judgment or other dispositive motion with respect to the claims against him found to be cognizable no later than twenty-eight (28) days from the date this order is filed. Briefing shall proceed thereafter in accordance with the schedule and instructions set forth in the Court's Order of Service, filed May 17, 2011, (Docket No. 6). Signed Hon. Edward J. Davila on 9/17/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
|
July 13, 2012 |
Filing
42
ORDER. Because Plaintiff already has filed an opposition to the pending motion for summary judgment in this case, he may file a supplemental opposition within 15 days of this order. Defendants shall file a supplemental reply to any supplemental opposition within 7 days thereafter. Responses due by 7/25/2012. Replies due by 8/1/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/10/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
|
June 24, 2011 |
Filing
20
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE COURT WITH MORE INFORMATION FOR UNSERVEDDEFENDANTS. Plaintiff must file notice and provide the Court with the accurate current location of Defendants Hammond and Williams within thirty (30) days of the date this order is filed, such that the Marshal is able to effect service. If Plaintiff fails to provide the Court with an accurate current location for these Defendants in the time provided, Plaintiff's claims against Hammond and Williams will be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/23/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?