In re: Google Inc. Street View Electronic Communications Litigation Featured Case
Case Number: 5:2010md02184
Filed: August 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 83 Motion for Certificate of Appealability (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2011)
July 15, 2011 Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to case. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 15, 2011 Filing 89 RESPONSE (re 83 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Certification Under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) ) Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendant Google Inc.s Motion for Certification Under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) filed byDean M. Bastilla, Matthew Berlage, David Carney, Russell Carter, Stephanie Carter, Jeffrey Colman, James Fairbanks, Edward Fenn, Galaxy Internet Services, Inc.,, Deepa Isac, Patrick Keyes, Eric Lacerte, Aaron Linsky, Jennifer Locsin, Neil Mertz, Paul Mulholland, Eric Myhre, John E. Redstone, Karl H. Schulz, B. Stokes, Vicki Van Valin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY REFERRAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/14/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 84 Motion to Shorten Time (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 86 Proposed Order re 83 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Certification Under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) by Google, Inc.. (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 85 Declaration of Michael H. Rubin in Support of 84 MOTION to Shorten Time Defendant Google Inc.'s Local Rule 6-3 Motion to Shorten Time to Hear Motion for Certification filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Related document(s) 84 ) (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 84 MOTION to Shorten Time Defendant Google Inc.'s Local Rule 6-3 Motion to Shorten Time to Hear Motion for Certification filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 83 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Certification Under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) filed by Google, Inc.. (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 63 Motion to Strike (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2011)
April 15, 2011 Filing 81 RESPONSE (re 60 MOTION to Dismiss ) TO BRIEF FOR AMICUS CURIAE ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
April 11, 2011 Filing 80 Brief re 60 MOTION to Dismiss, 64 Reply Memorandum,, 73 Order Defendant Google Inc.'s Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Related document(s) 60 , 64 , 73 ) (Kramer, David) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 11, 2011 Filing 79 Brief re 67 Reply to Opposition/Response, 60 MOTION to Dismiss, 64 Reply Memorandum,, SUPPLEMENTAL filed byDean M. Bastilla, Rick Benitti, Matthew Berlage, David Carney, Russell Carter, Stephanie Carter, Jeffrey Colman, Bertha Davis, James Fairbanks, Benjamin Joffe, Patrick Keyes, Aaron Linsky, Jennifer Locsin, Lilla Marigza, John E. Redstone, Karl H. Schulz, Vicki Van Valin. (Related document(s) 67 , 60 , 64 ) (Byrd, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 11, 2011 Filing 78 Brief for Amicus Curiae Electronic Privacy Information Center in Support of Plaintiffs filed byElectronic Privacy Information Center. (Chavez, Mark) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 8, 2011 Filing 77 CLERKS NOTICE advising counsel of acknowledgment of receipt of case Lacerte v. Google Inc., C.A. No. 2:11-01883 from the District of Pennsylvania (OUR CASE No. C11-1697 JW HRL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 7, 2011 Filing 76 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-4 from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, that the action is transferred to the Northern District of California and assigned to the Honorable James Ware. Eric Lacerte v. Google, Inc., E.D. Pennsylvania,C.A. No. 2:11-01883 JHS has been given individual case number C11-1697 JW HRL. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2011)
March 23, 2011 Filing 75 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03-21-11, before Judge James Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2011. (las, ) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
March 21, 2011 Filing 74 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/21/2011 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 3/21/2011) re 63 MOTION to Strike 60 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC.S EXPERT REPORT FROM ITS MOTION TO DISMISS; 60 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Google, Inc. The Court took the matters under submission after oral argument. The Court to issue further Order following hearing. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/21/2011)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Requesting Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge James Ware on March 21, 2011. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 72 REPLY (re 63 MOTION to Strike 60 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC.S EXPERT REPORT FROM ITS MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION to Strike filed by Dean M. Bastilla, Rick Benitti, Matthew Berlage, David Carney, Russell Carter, Stephanie Carter, Jeffrey Colman, Bertha Davis, James Fairbanks, Benjamin Joffe, Patrick Keyes, Aaron Linsky, Jennifer Locsin, Lilla Marigza, John E. Redstone, Karl H. Schulz, Vicki Van Valin. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Proof of Service)(Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/7/2011) Modified on 3/7/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2011 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Harvey Jay Rosenfield Amended Notice (Rosenfield, Harvey) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
February 28, 2011 Filing 70 RESPONSE (re 63 MOTION to Strike 60 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC.S EXPERT REPORT FROM ITS MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION to Strike filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 2/28/2011) Modified on 3/1/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2011 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Harvey Jay Rosenfield (Rosenfield, Harvey) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
February 22, 2011 Filing 68 Declaration of Michael H. Rubin in Support of 67 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 67 ) (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 22, 2011 Filing 67 REPLY (re 60 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request for Extension of Deadline to File Reply re 65 Stipulation. On or before February 22, 2011, Google shall file its Reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/11/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 65 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Changing Date for Google's Reply from 2/21/11 because that date is a legal holiday to 2/22/11. in Support of its Motion to Dismiss by Google, Inc.. (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 2/10/2011) Modified text on 2/10/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2011 Filing 64 Reply Memorandum re 60 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byDean M. Bastilla, Rick Benitti, Matthew Berlage, Russell Carter, Stephanie Carter, Jeffrey Colman, Bertha Davis, James Fairbanks, Benjamin Joffe, Patrick Keyes, Aaron Linsky, Jennifer Locsin, Lilla Marigza, John E. Redstone, Karl H. Schulz, Vicki Van Valin. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Proof of Service)(Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 25, 2011 Filing 63 MOTION to Strike 60 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC.S EXPERT REPORT FROM ITS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Dean M. Bastilla, Rick Benitti, Matthew Berlage, Russell Carter, Stephanie Carter, Jeffrey Colman, Bertha Davis, James Fairbanks, Benjamin Joffe, Patrick Keyes, Aaron Linsky, Jennifer Locsin, Lilla Marigza, John E. Redstone, Karl H. Schulz, Vicki Van Valin. Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. James Ware. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order, # 2 Supplement Proof Of Service)(Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
December 17, 2010 Filing 62 Proposed Order re 60 MOTION to Dismiss by Google, Inc.. (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 17, 2010 Filing 61 Declaration of Michael H. Rubin in Support of 60 MOTION to Dismiss filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(Related document(s) 60 ) (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 17, 2010 Filing 60 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Google, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 16, 2010 Filing 58 CLERKS NOTICE advising counsel of acknowledgment of receipt of case Myhre v. Google Inc., C.A. No. 2:10-01444 from the District of Washington (Western) (OUR CASE No. C10-5667 JW PVT) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, that the action is transferred to the Northern District of California and assigned to the Honorable James Ware. Myhre v. Google, Inc., WAW,C.A. No. 2:10-01444 has been given individual case number C10-5667 JW HRL. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2010)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION IN PART; STAYING DISCOVERY PENDING RULING ON ANTICIPATED DISPOSITIVE MOTION re 56 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines : Motion to Dismiss due by 12/17/2010. Opposition due by 1/25/2011. Reply due by 2/21/2011. Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/22/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 19, 2010 Filing 56 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation [And] Proposed Scheduling Order by Google, Inc.. (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 9, 2010 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dean M. Bastilla, Rick Benitti, Matthew Berlage, Russell Carter, Stephanie Carter, Jeffrey Colman, Bertha Davis, James Fairbanks, Benjamin Joffe, Patrick Keyes, Aaron Linsky, Jennifer Locsin, Lilla Marigza, John E. Redstone, Karl H. Schulz, Vicki Van Valin re 54 Amended Complaint, [Proof of Service via Electronic and US Mail] (Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
November 8, 2010 Filing 54 CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against In re: Google Inc. Street View Electronic Communications Litigation. Filed by Vicki Van Valin, Matthew Berlage, Jennifer Locsin, John E. Redstone, James Fairbanks, Benjamin Joffe, Patrick Keyes, Rick Benitti, Dean M. Bastilla, Lilla Marigza, Russell Carter, Stephanie Carter, Karl H. Schulz, Jeffrey Colman, Aaron Linsky, Bertha Davis. (Barnett, Kathryn) (Filed on 11/8/2010) Modified on 11/9/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 51 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/4/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting 49 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Douglas A. Millen. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/4/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
November 4, 2010 Filing 51 AMENDED STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Newly Filed Related Cases amendment to 50 by Google, Inc.. (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 11/4/2010) Modified on 11/4/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2010 Filing 50 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see amended 51 STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Newly Filed Related Cases by Google, Inc.. (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 11/3/2010) Modified on 11/4/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2010 Filing 49 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Douglas A. Millen ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611052291.) filed by Benjamin Joffe. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING 45 MOTION TO RELATE CASES; CONSOLIDATING C 10-4079 INTO MLD MASTER' S ACTION. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court shall immediately relate Bertha Davis, et al., v. Google, Inc., Case No. CV 10-4079-WHA to In re: Google Inc. Street View Electronic Communications Litigation, Case No. CV 10-MD-2184-JW. Upon relating the cases, the Clerk of Court shall consolidate C 10-4079 into the Master MDL case, C 10-2184 and administratively close the new member case. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/15/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER APPOINTING INTERIM CLASS, CO-LEAD AND LIAISON COUNSEL, granting 35 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 36 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 38 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Further, pursuant to the Court's September 14, 2010 Order, on or before November 8, 2010, Plaintiffs shall file a Master Consolidated Complaint that includes all claims against Defendant Google, both Federal and State. Upon the filing of the Master Consolidated Complaint, the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Stipulation with respect to how this case should proceed including, a schedule for Defendant's response to the Complaint and anticipated dispositive Motions. The Joint Stipulation shall be filed on or before November 19, 2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/8/2010 (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2010) Modified text on 10/8/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2010 Filing 46 Declaration of Sharron Williams Gelobter in support of 45 Motion to relate cases filed by Bertha Davis. (Gelobter, Sharron) (Filed on 10/7/2010) Modified on 10/7/2010,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2010 Filing 45 MOTION to Relate Case C10-4079 WHA filed by Bertha Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Proposed Order)(Gelobter, Sharron) (Filed on 10/7/2010) Modified on 10/7/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2010 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Philip Manookian (Manookian, Brian) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 30, 2010 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Sobol (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 30, 2010 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth S. Byrd (Byrd, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 30, 2010 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Elaine Barnett (Barnett, Kathryn) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 29, 2010 Filing 40 Statement of Non-Opposition re 38 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Jay Edelson and Scott Kamber as interim co-lead counsel, 36 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Stephen A. Swedlow of Korein Tillery as Interim Lead Class Counsel, 35 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Jeffrey Kodroff and Daniel Small as Interim Class and Co-Lead Counsel and Elizabeth Cabraser as Interim Class and Liaison Counsel filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Related document(s) 38 , 36 , 35 ) (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 28, 2010 Filing 39 Proposed Order re 38 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Jay Edelson and Scott Kamber as interim co-lead counsel by B. Stokes. (Reis, Sean) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 27, 2010 Filing 38 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Jay Edelson and Scott Kamber as interim co-lead counsel filed by B. Stokes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Jay Edelson, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 - Edelson McGuire FIrm Resume, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A-2 - KamberLaw Firm Resume, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Stroz Friedberg Report)(Richman, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 27, 2010 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Harris Richman on behalf of B. Stokes (Richman, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 27, 2010 Filing 36 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Stephen A. Swedlow of Korein Tillery as Interim Lead Class Counsel filed by Dean M. Bastilla, John E. Redstone, Karl H. Schulz. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2010 09:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Stephen M. Tillery, # 2 Affidavit of Stephen A. Swedlow, # 3 Proposed Order)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 27, 2010 Filing 35 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Jeffrey Kodroff and Daniel Small as Interim Class and Co-Lead Counsel and Elizabeth Cabraser as Interim Class and Liaison Counsel filed by Lilla Marigza. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Spector Roseman Firm Resume, # 2 Exhibit 2: CMST Firm Resume, # 3 Exhibit 3: Declaration of Elizabeth Cabraser, # 4 Proposed Order)(Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 27, 2010 Filing 34 CLERKS NOTICE advising counsel of acknowledgment of receipt of case Paul Mulholland v. Google Inc., C.A. No. 2:10-02787-JHS from the District of Pennsylvania (OUR CASE No. C10-4269 JW PVT) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Paul Gignac on behalf of Rick Benitti (Gignac, J. Paul) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 21, 2010 Filing 32 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1 from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, that the action is transferred to the Northern District of California and assigned to the Honorable James Ware. Paul Mulholland v. Google, Inc., E.D. Pennsylvania,C.A. No. 2:10-2787 has been given individual case number C10-4269 JW HRL. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RELATED CASE ORDER. On or before 11/8/2010, Plaintiffs shall file a Master Consolidated Complaint that includes all claims against Defendant Google, both Federal and State. The Court will set an interim Case Management Conference once the Master Consolidated Complaint is filed. C 10-04007 HRL Joffe v. Google, Inc. and C 10-04084 PVT Marigza et al v. Google, Inc. shall be added as a member cases to C 10-02184 JW In re Google Street View. C 10-02187 JW Berlage et al v. Google, Inc. has previously been added as a member case to C 10-02184 JW In re Google Street View. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Susan D. Fahringer and Bobbie Jean Wilson terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/16/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 15, 2010 Filing 29 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Google, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Fahringer, Susan) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. On or before 9/27/2010, Plaintiffs shall file their motions for appointment of Lead Interim Counsel under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g) and any stipulation regarding consolidation of cases, including tag along cases. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, these motions will be taken under submission for consideration without oral argument. On or before 11/8/2010, Plaintiffs shall file a Master Consolidated Complaint that includes all claims against Defendant Google, both Federal and State. The Court will set an interim Case Management Conference once the Master Consolidated Complaint is filed. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/14/210. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
September 13, 2010 Filing 27 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/13/2010 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 9/13/2010). The Court to issue further order following conference. (Court Reporter Unreported.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/13/2010)
September 13, 2010 Filing 26 Letter from John A. Macoretta addressed to the Honorable James Ware. (Macoretta, John) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
September 13, 2010 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael James Aschenbrener on Behalf of Plaintiff B. Stokes (Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline Elizabeth Wilson (Wilson, Caroline) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Bart Edward Volkmer, Esq (Volkmer, Bart) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H. Rubin (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Kramer (Kramer, David) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 20 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING TIME FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR FILING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT in case 5:10-cv-02187-JW; denying (14) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:10-md-02184-JW. Deadline to file Joint Case Management Conference statement due by 9/7/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/2/2010. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 18 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc.. (Fahringer, Susan) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RELATING CASE. The Court finds that 5:10-md-02184-JW and C 10-02187 JW, 5:10-cv-03215-PVT, 5:10-cv-03272-PVT, 5:10-cv-03297-PVT, 5:10-cv-03715-PVT ARE RELATED. Motions terminated: 7 MOTION to Relate Case filed by David Carney, 10 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Jennifer Locsin. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/3/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 16 CLERKS NOTICE advising counsel of acknowledgment of receipt of case Vicki Van Valin v. Google Inc., C.A. No. 3:10-557 from the District of Oregon (OUR CASE No. C10-3641 JW PVT) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
August 31, 2010 Filing 15 Notice of Joinder in Plaintiffs' 14 Motion for extension of time to file Joint Case Management Statement (Fahringer, Susan) (Filed on 8/31/2010) Modified text on 8/31/2010,(link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2010 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Case Management Statement filed by Dean M. Bastilla, John E. Redstone, Karl H. Schulz. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 13 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNECE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2010. Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 12 Proposed Order to 10 Administratively Relate Case by Jennifer Locsin. (Terrell, Reginald) (Filed on 8/26/2010) Modified on 8/26/2010,(link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2010 Filing 11 Declaration of Reginald Terrell In Support of Administrative 10 Motion to Relate Action filed by Jennifer Locsin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Judicial Panel Conditional Transfer Order)(Terrell, Reginald) (Filed on 8/26/2010) Modified on 8/26/2010,(link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2010 Filing 10 MOTION to Relate Case 10-3272 PVT filed by Jennifer Locsin. (Terrell, Reginald) (Filed on 8/26/2010) Modified on 8/26/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2010 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Carney re 8 Declaration in Support, 7 MOTION to Relate Case (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 25, 2010 Filing 8 Declaration of ERIC H. GIBBS in Support of 7 MOTION to Relate Case filed byDavid Carney. (Related document(s) 7 ) (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 25, 2010 Filing 7 MOTION to Relate Case C10-3715 PVT filed by David Carney. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 8/25/2010) Modified on 8/26/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2010 Filing 6 CLERKS NOTICE advising counsel of acknowledgment of receipt of case Patrick Keyes v. Google Inc., C.A. No. 1:10-896 from the District of Columbia (OUR CASE No. C10-3638 JW PVT) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 25, 2010 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE advising counsel of acknowledgment of receipt of case Jeffrey Colman v. Google Inc., C.A. No. 1:10-877 from the District of Columbia (OUR CASE No. C10-3637 JW PVT) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE advising counsel of acknowledgment of receipt of case Stephanie Carter v. Google Inc., C.A. No. 2:10-2649 from the Eastern District of Pennsylvania (OUR CASE No. C10-3642 JW PVT) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 3 CLERKS NOTICE advising counsel of acknowledgment of receipt of case Galaxy Internet Services, Inc., v. Google Inc., C.A. No. 1:10-10871 from the District of Massachusetts (OUR CASE No. C10-3640 JW PVT). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 20, 2010 Filing 2 CLERKS NOTICE advising counsel of acknowledgment of receipt of case Redstone v. Google, Inc., C.A. No. 3:10-400 from the Southern District of Illinois (OUR CASE No. C10-3639 JW PVT). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010) Modified on 8/24/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2010 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, that the action is transferred to the Northern District of California creating MDL No. 10-2184 JW (PVT). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010) Modified on 8/20/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Google Inc. Street View Electronic Communications Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?