Solannex, Inc. v. MiaSole, Inc.
Plaintiff: Solannex, Inc.
Defendant: MiaSole, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2011cv00171
Filed: January 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO COMPEL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 18, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 182 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 10, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 27, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER RE CONSOLIDATION, DENYING 168 54(B) CERTIFICATION, AND DENYING MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS by Judge Paul S. Grewal (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER re Docket No. 165 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 19, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 164 FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on November 16, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER GRANTING QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN LLP'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 150 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Claude M. Stern terminated (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER STAYING CASE THROUGH OCTOBER 16, 2012 re 147 Proposed Order filed by MiaSole, Inc., Solannex, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 24, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 137 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION denying 128 Motion for Leave to File; denying 131 Motion to Strike 128 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Motion to Consolidate (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 115 Motion to Consolidate Cases (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 112 Stipulation filed by Solannex, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 3, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION AND ORDER ENLARGING TIME FOR PRIVATE ADR SESSION, re 89 Stipulation filed by MiaSole, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 11/1/2011. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND ORDER ENLARGING TIME FOR PATENT LR 4-3 JOINT CLIAM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT re 85 Stipulation filed by MiaSole, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on October 11, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MIASOLE'S MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS OF WILLFUL PATENT INFRINGEMENT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 64 Motion to Dismiss (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 19, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 59 Stipulation filed by MiaSole, Inc., Solannex, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 25, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 15, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT re 53 Stipulation filed by Solannex, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 2, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 42 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR filed by Solannex, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 20, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE SEE DOCKET 37 . CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 4, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011) Modified on 4/4/2011 (ofr, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE TO MARCH 15, 2011 at 2PM re 27 Stipulation filed by MiaSole, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 28, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solannex, Inc. v. MiaSole, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solannex, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E. Dergosits
Represented By: Califf T. Cooper
Represented By: Edward W. Goldstein
Represented By: Alisa Anne Lipski
Represented By: Igor Shoiket
Represented By: Corby R. Vowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MiaSole, Inc.
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Represented By: Ray R. Zado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?