Abbott v. Tootell et al
Plaintiff: Joe Abbott
Defendant: E. Tootell, J. Grant, M. Jones, J. Matan, J. Arnold and C. Semen
Case Number: 5:2011cv00183
Filed: January 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 10/18/2017. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. The parties did not reach an agreement. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 7/2/14. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 167 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/8/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
May 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER Rescheduling Telephonic Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor Vadas on 5/2/14. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2014)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER PROVIDING PLAINTIFF NOTICE AND WARNING. If Defendants file a motion to dismiss and it is granted, your case will be dismissed and there will be no trial. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/16/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abbott v. Tootell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Tootell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Matan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Semen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?